ACE American Insurance Company v. Dish Network, LLC

Plaintiff: ACE American Insurance Company
Defendant: Dish Network, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv00560
Filed: March 4, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2016 172 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk: in favor of ACE American Insurance Company against Dish Network LLC re: 171 Order Concerning Cross Motions for Summary Judgment. By Clerk on 3/28/16. (kfinn)
March 25, 2016 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as Moot 93 Ace American Insurance Companys Motion to Enjoin Dish from Prosecuting Parallel Litigation in the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois; Denying as Moot 95 Ace American Insurance Companys Motion to Shorten Time for Consideration of Motion to Enjoin Dish from Prosecuting Parallel Litigation in the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois; Denying as Moot 123 Motion of Dish Network L.L.C. To Strike the Decl aration and Expert Report of John Kezer, Esq. And Supporting Memorandum; Denying 154 Joint Motion Requesting Oral Argument on Cross-motions for Summary Judgment; Denying as Moot 155 Travelers Property Casualty Company of Americas Motion to Intervene for a Limited Purpose. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/25/2016.(cmira)
February 19, 2016 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONCERNING MOTIONS TO BIFURCATE, STAY, & CONTINUE TRIAL. Defendant Dish Network L.L.C.'s Motion To Stay or Transfer and Supporting Memorandum of Law [#92] filed June 5, 2015, is denied; That the Stipulated Motion To Continue Trial and Modi fy Scheduling Order [#148] filed September 29, 2015, is granted to the extent that the currently scheduled trial in this case is continued; granting in part and denying in part 162 Renewed Motion To Bifurcate Pursuant To FRCP 42(b) and To Administ ratively Stay Indemnity-Related Claims. That the combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for February 26, 2016, and the trial set to begin March 14, 2016, arevacated and continued without date, pending further order. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/19/2016.(agarc, )
September 25, 2015 147 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Ten (10) day Jury Trial set for 3/14/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 2/26/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/25/2015. (mlace, )
September 9, 2015 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 69 Joint Motion To Bifurcate Pursuant to FRCP 42(b); approving and adopting 75 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge; approving and adopting 81 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge; granting 134 Stipula ted Motion To Continue Pretrial Conference Scheduled for September 18, 2015.The combined Trial Preparation Conference and Final Pretrial Conference set September 18, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. (MDT), is vacated and continued without date pending further order.The trial set to begin October 2, 2015, at 8:30 a.m.(MDT), is vacated and continued without date pending further order. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/9/2015.(mlace, )
June 16, 2015 105 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 88 Amended Motion to Shorten Time for Consideration of Motion to Exclude by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/16/2015.(mdave )
February 23, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: denying 76 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena to Appropriate Authority in Cook County, Illinois; and, denying 77 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena to Appropriate Authority in New York. Discussion was held regarding an extension of hearings and deadlines. Status Conference held on 2/23/2015. FTR: Courtroom a 501. (mdave )
February 2, 2015 73 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/2/2015. (alowe)
July 14, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/11/2015. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set 9/18/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Fourteen (14) day Jury Trial set 10/5/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/14/14. (rebsec)
June 23, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 54 Stipulation and Joint Motion for Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/23/2014. (cpear)
March 3, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 38 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Reply Memorandum of Dish Network in Support of Its Objection to Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge [# 37 ]. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/3/2014.(klyon, )
July 16, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Temporary Stay and to Vacate Scheduling Conference Order. This matter is stayed pending further order of the Court, and the Scheduling Conference set for 7/31/2013 is vacated. The parties sh all file a status report with the Court within five business days of the District Courts ruling on Defendant's pending Motion to Dismiss indicating what, if any, scheduling may be needed. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/16/2013. (mehcd)
July 2, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 24 Unopposed Motion to Vacate Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Reset Scheduling Conference Date. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/2/2013.(klyon, )
May 16, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Unopposed Motion to Vacate Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Reset Scheduling Conference Date. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 5/23/2013 is vacated and rescheduled to 7/31/2013, at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/16/2013. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACE American Insurance Company v. Dish Network, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher S. Clemenson
Represented By: Francis Douglas Tuffley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dish Network, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?