Armstrong et al v. Sebelius et al
Plaintiff: |
W. L. Armstrong, Jeffrey S. May, Dorothy A. Shanahan, Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., William L. Armstrong, III and John A. May |
Defendant: |
United States Department of Health and Human Services, Seth D. Harris, Jacob J. Lew, United States Department of Labor, United States Department of the Treasury and Kathleen Sebelius |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv00563 |
Filed: |
March 5, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Arapahoe |
Presiding Judge: |
R. Brooke Jackson |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 2000 bb Religious Freedom Restoration Act. |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 29, 2014 |
Filing
78
ORDER : The regulations promulgated by the Department of Health and Human Services under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act of 2010 described in Hobby Lobby as "the contraceptive mandate" cannot lawfully be applied to Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc. or to the individual plaintiffs in this case. Judgment shall enter. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/29/14. (jdyne, )
|
September 17, 2013 |
Filing
56
ORDER : The defendants, their officers and employees are preliminarily enjoined from any further effort to apply or enforce against Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc. or the individual plaintiffs the preventive services requirements found at 42 U.S.C. § 300gg-13(a)(4) or the application of penalties found in 26 U.S.C. § 4980D, 26 U.S.C. § 4980H, and 29 U.S.C. § 1132, pending further order of this Court. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/17/2013. (trlee, )
|
August 19, 2013 |
Filing
54
ORDER: If (1) plaintiffs file a motion to suspend their appeal pending reconsideration of the injunction issue by this Court, which the government has indicated it will not oppose, or (2) the defendant files a similar motion in the Circuit, and ( 3) either as a result of such a motion by either party or sua sponte the Tenth Circuit remands the case to this Court to reconsider its decision in light of Hobby Lobby, the Court will then do so. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 08/19/13. (alvsl)
|
August 1, 2013 |
Filing
50
ORDER Plaintiffs have moved for an order reversing this Courts order of May 10, 2013, and therefore granting a preliminary injunction as requested, in light of the en banc decision in Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. v. Sebelius, 2013 WL 3216103 (10th Cir. June 27, 2013). See Order for Details, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/1/2013. (ervsl, )
|
May 10, 2013 |
Filing
38
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson: Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction held on 5/10/2013. ORDERED:The Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction 12 is DENIED. Hearing concluded. Court Reporter: Kara Spitler. (wjmcd, )
|
March 7, 2013 |
Filing
10
ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 03/07/2013. (rbjsec. )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?