Ortiz v. Falk et al
Plaintiff: Alexis R. Ortiz
Defendant: Tom Clements, James Falk, Beverly Dowis, Gatbel Chamjock, Joann Stock, Joseph G. Fortunato, Hoffman and Medical Staff at Sterling Correctional Facility
Case Number: 1:2013cv00612
Filed: March 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER. ORDERED that plaintiff Alexis R. Ortiz's Notice of Objection 174 , construed as a motion to reopen the time to appeal and as a motion to accept plaintiff's notice of appeal out of time, is GRANTED. ORDERED that plaintiff Alexis R. Ortiz's Notice of Appeal filed on November 10, 2015 is deemed to be timely filed. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall provide the Court of Appeals with a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 01/14/16. (jhawk, )
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/26/15. ORDERED: The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 148 is ACCEPTED. ORDERED: Defendants Beverly Dowis and Lieutenant Hoffman's Motion for Summary Judgment 136 is GRANTED. ORDERED that plaintiff's third and sixth claims are dismissed. ORDERED: Plaintiff Alexis R. Ortiz's Motion for Summary Judgment 160 is DENIED. ORDERED: Plaintiff Alexis R. Ortiz's Objection to Magistrate Judge's OrderDenying Motion to Appoin t Pro Bono Representation from the Civil Pro Bono Program 165 is OVERRULED. ORDERED: Within 14 days of the entry of judgment, defendants may have their costs by filing a bill of costs with the Clerk of the Court. ORDERED: This case is dismissed in its entirety.(kpreu)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 166 Plaintiff's Motion for Register of Action/Docket Sheet & Status, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/16/2015.(emill)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MINUTE ORDER granting 153 Motion to Vacate the Final Pretrial Conference. Final Pretrial Conference 2/9/2015 10:00 AM is vacated. It will be reset, if necessary, following Judge Brimmer's ruling on the report and recommendation issued on motion for summary judgment. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/3/2015.(emill)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MINUTE ORDER. ORDERED that plaintiff's two Motions for Written Deposition/ Interrogatories (Docket Nos. 138 and 139), which were filed on October 17, 2014, are both denied by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/17/14.(jhawk, )
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER. ORDERED that plaintiff Alexis R. Ortiz's Motion Objecting To Judge Philip Brimmer's Order For Motion To Dismiss Filed By Defendants [Docket No. 98] is DENIED. ORDERED that plaintiffs'Motion Objecting [to] Judge Philip Brimmer's Order Accepting Magistrate Judges Recommendation On Docket No 96 [Docket No. 111] is DENIED by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/04/14.(jhawk, )
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MINUTE ORDER denying 129 Motion for Injunction for Notes, Dictations, Recomendations [sic], and Recordings from Dr. Darrel T. Fenton & M.D. Eric R. Handly by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 09/10/14.(jhawk, )
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 113 Motion for Order; denying 115 Motion for Order by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 06/20/14.(jhawk, )
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Accepting Magistrate Judge's Recommendation. Ordered that the recommendation 96 is Accepted. Ordered that the Motion to Dismiss 91 is Granted. Ordered that all claims against defendant Maurice Fauvel are dismissed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 05/27/14.(jhawk, )
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER. ORDERED that the Recommendation on (1) Motion to Dismiss Filed byDefendants James Falk, Lieutenant Hoffman, and JoAnn Stock (Docket No. 41);(2) Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Beverly Dowis (Docket No. 65); and(3) Plaintiff's Motion to Add Defendants (Docket No. 87) [Docket No. 89] is ADOPTED. ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss 41 filed by defendants James Falk, Lieutenant Hoffman, and JoAnn Stock is GRANTED in part. ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss 65 filed by defendant Beverly Dowis is GRANTED in part. ORDERED that the Motion to Add Defendants 87 filed by plaintiff Alexis Ortiz is DENIED by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/13/14.(jhawk, )
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER. The 79 Motion to Object to Stay Discovery Granted and to Object to the Scheduling Order Submitted by Defendants is overruled to the extent plaintiff objects to the stay of discovery. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/18/14.(mfiel, )
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MINUTE ORDER denying 84 plaintiff's "Amended Motion", by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/13/2014.(mjwcd)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER ACCEPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S 75 RECOMMENDATION. All claims against defendant Joseph G. Fortunato are dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.1. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/30/13.(mnfsl, )
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE ORDER granting 70 Motion to Stay Discovery. Scheduling Conference 12/9/2013 09:00 AM is vacated. Show Cause Hearing remains set 12/9/2013 09:00 AM with respect to plaintiff's failure to serve defendant Fortunato. Order to Show Cause 44 is vacated soley with respect to the lack of service on Dowis. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/5/2013.(mjwcd)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER denying as premature 62 plaintiff's Motion for Scheduling Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/7/2013.(mjwcd)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Setting Status Conference for 9/10/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/3/13. (mnfsl, )
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/25/2013. (skl)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/28/2013. (skl)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/11/2013. (skl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Falk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis R. Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Dowis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gatbel Chamjock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joann Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph G. Fortunato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Staff at Sterling Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?