Harden et al v. Krabloonik, Inc.
Plaintiff: Harry Harden and Melody Harden
Defendant: Krabloonik, Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2013cv00653
Filed: March 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P Matsch
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2015 Filing 73 TRANSCRIPT of Final Pretrial Conference held on February 6, 2015 before Judge Matsch. Pages: 1-27. Prepared by: Federal Reporting Service, Inc. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Federal Reporting Service, Inc., )
March 19, 2015 Filing 72 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re #69 Clerk's Judgment entered In favor of Melody Harden Against Krabloonik, Incorporated Plaintiff Melody Harden's Satisfaction of Judgment by Plaintiff Melody Harden. (Burg, Jacob)
March 19, 2015 Filing 71 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re #70 Clerk's Judgment entered In favor of Harry Harden Against Krabloonik, Incorporated Plaintiff Harry Harden's Satisfaction of Judgment by Plaintiff Harry Harden. (Burg, Jacob)
March 2, 2015 Filing 70 FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 68 by Clerk in favor of Harry Harden against Krabloonik, Incorporated re: #68 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment, by Clerk on 3/2/2015. (evana, )
March 2, 2015 Filing 69 FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 68 by Clerk in favor of Melody Harden against Krabloonik, Incorporated re: #68 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment, by Clerk on 3/2/2015. (evana, )
February 27, 2015 Filing 68 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Acceptance of Defendant Krabloonik's Offers of Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 68 and Request for Forthwith Entry of Judgment Thereon by Plaintiffs Harry Harden, Melody Harden (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Offers of Judgment, #2 Exhibit 2 - Acceptance of Judgment)(Hersh, David)
February 6, 2015 Filing 67 COURTROOM MINUTES for Pretrial Conference held before Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/6/2015. Denying #56 Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Myron Angstman. Denying #57 Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Ric Robinette. Final Pretrial Order entered. FTR: K. Terasaki. (ebuch)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (ebuch)
January 29, 2015 Filing 65 RESPONSE to #56 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Myron Angstman filed by Plaintiffs Harry Harden, Melody Harden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Burg, Jacob)
January 29, 2015 Filing 64 RESPONSE to #57 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Ric Robinette filed by Plaintiffs Harry Harden, Melody Harden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Eisenstein, Jacob)
January 21, 2015 Filing 63 Utility Confirming Setting of Final Pretrial Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/6/2015 11:00 AM before Judge Richard P. Matsch. Text Only Entry (evana, )
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER granting #61 Defendants unopposed motion to reschedule the February 27, 2015, pretrial conference. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/29/2015. Final Pretrial Conference is RESET for 2/6/2015 11:00 AM in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/20/2015.(evana, ) (Modified on 1/21/2015 edited the text to reflect the time as 11:00 AM)(evana, ).
January 20, 2015 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Pre-Trial Conference by Defendant Krabloonik, Incorporated. (Strauss, Mary)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Pursuant to the #58 Order Denying Defendants Motion for Summary entered by this Court on January 6, 2015, it is ORDERED that a pretrial conference is scheduled for February 27, 2015, at 11:00 a.m. in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/19/2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/13/2015 (evana, )
January 7, 2015 Filing 59 Conventionally Submitted Material : Exhibit E on a CD, to MOTION for Summary Judgment #55 by Defendant Krabloonik, Incorporated. Material placed in oversized area A-7-7 of the Clerk's Office. Text Only Entry (evana, )
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying #55 defendant Krabloonik, Incorporated Motion for Summary Judgment. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a pretrial conference will be scheduled, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/6/2015.(evana, )
January 5, 2015 Filing 57 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Ric Robinette by Defendant Krabloonik, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Strauss, Mary)
January 5, 2015 Filing 56 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Myron Angstman by Defendant Krabloonik, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Strauss, Mary)
January 5, 2015 Filing 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Krabloonik, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit Exhibit H)(Strauss, Mary)
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting #43 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Testimony of Defendants Expert Michael Robinson ; Denying as moot #44 Plaintiffs' Motion for Enlargement of time, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/31/2014.(evana, )
December 31, 2014 Filing 53 REPLY to Response to #44 MOTION for Extension of Time to Plaintiffs' Motion for an Enlargement of Time Pursuant to Fed.Civ.P. 6(b)(1)(A) filed by Plaintiffs Harry Harden, Melody Harden. (Burg, Jacob)
December 31, 2014 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to #43 MOTION to Strike The Testimony of Defendant's Expert Michael Robinson filed by Plaintiffs Harry Harden, Melody Harden. (Burg, Jacob)
December 17, 2014 Filing 51 RESPONSE to #43 MOTION to Strike The Testimony of Defendant's Expert Michael Robinson by Defendant Krabloonik, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Strauss, Mary)
December 17, 2014 Filing 50 RESPONSE to #44 MOTION for Extension of Time to Plaintiffs' Motion for an Enlargement of Time Pursuant to Fed.Civ.P. 6(b)(1)(A) by Defendant Krabloonik, Incorporated. (Strauss, Mary)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER To Comply With D.C. COLO.L.CivR7.2. The Court has signed a Protective Order for the confidentiality of certain information in this case. The order does not expressly provide for compliance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 in court filings. It is ORDERED, that in all court filings, counsel shall comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 as to any information to be submitted under restriction based on the Protective Order, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/17/2014. (evana, )
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PROTECTIVE ORDER, THIS COURT, finding good cause exists to grant #47 the entry of a protective order and being otherwise fully advised, HEREBY APPROVES the same, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/17/2014. (evana, )
December 17, 2014 Filing 47 NOTICE re #46 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order for Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(6) Deposition of Krabloonik, Inc. Notice of Filing of Proposed Protective Order by Defendant Krabloonik, Incorporated (Strauss, Mary)
December 17, 2014 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order for Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(6) Deposition of Krabloonik, Inc. by Defendant Krabloonik, Incorporated. (Strauss, Mary)
December 8, 2014 Filing 45 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jacob M. Burg on behalf of Harry Harden, Melody HardenAttorney Jacob M. Burg added to party Harry Harden(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob M. Burg added to party Melody Harden(pty:pla) (Burg, Jacob)
November 26, 2014 Filing 44 MOTION for Extension of Time to Plaintiffs' Motion for an Enlargement of Time Pursuant to Fed.Civ.P. 6(b)(1)(A) by Plaintiffs Harry Harden, Melody Harden. (Hersh, David)
November 26, 2014 Filing 43 MOTION to Strike The Testimony of Defendant's Expert Michael Robinson by Plaintiffs Harry Harden, Melody Harden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hersh, David)
November 5, 2014 Filing 42 STIPULATION Regarding the Admission of Plaintiffs' Medical Records and Billing Records by Plaintiffs Harry Harden, Melody Harden. (Hersh, David)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Setting Jury Trial set for 3/9/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A and Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/9/2015, in paper form directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m., by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/26/2014. (jsmit)
September 26, 2014 Filing 40 Joint STATUS Statement by Plaintiffs Harry Harden, Melody Harden, Defendant Krabloonik, Incorporated. (jsmit)
September 26, 2014 Filing 39 Courtroom Minutes for Calendar Call held on 9/26/2014 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: 5 day jury trial set March 9, 2015. Proposed pretrial order due February 9, 2015. FTR: K. Terasaki. (jsmit)
August 29, 2014 Filing 38 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David P. Hersh on behalf of Harry Harden, Melody HardenAttorney David P. Hersh added to party Harry Harden(pty:pla), Attorney David P. Hersh added to party Melody Harden(pty:pla) (Hersh, David)
August 28, 2014 Filing 37 NOTICE of Firm Change and Updated Contact Information by Plaintiffs Harry Harden, Melody Harden (Eisenstein, Jacob)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time re #22 : Dispositive Motions due by 1/5/2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/5/2014.(jsmit )
August 4, 2014 Filing 35 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions by Defendant Krabloonik, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Stipulation and Joint Motion to Extend Dispositive Motions Deadline)(Strauss, Mary)
July 31, 2014 Filing 34 NOTICE of Firm Name Change by Defendant Krabloonik, Incorporated (Overturf, Mark)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting #32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David John Stevens is withdrawn and NEF's terminated, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/30/2014.(jsmit) Modified to add Text Only Entry on 7/30/2014 (jsmit).
July 29, 2014 Filing 32 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Notice of Firm Information Change by Plaintiffs Harry Harden, Melody Harden. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Re: Motion to Withdraw)(Eisenstein, Jacob)
July 29, 2014 Filing 31 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on September 10, 2013 before Judge Matsch. Pages: 1-12. Prepared by: Federal Reporting Service, Inc. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2014. (Federal Reporting Service, Inc., )
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER FOR CALENDAR CALL set for 9/26/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A, and joint statement to be handed up when the case is called, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/25/2014. (jsmit)
July 22, 2014 Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference held on October 29, 2013 before Judge Matsch. Pages: 1-20. Prepared by: Federal Reporting Service, Inc. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/23/2014. (Federal Reporting Service, Inc., )
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time re #22 : 1. The revised Plaintiff's Expert Disclosure Deadline is September 29, 2014; 2. The revised Defendant's Expert Disclosure Deadline is October 30, 2014; 3. The revised deadline for any Rebuttal opinions will be November 29, 2014; 4. The revised Final Discovery Cut-Off date, including deposing of experts, will be December 15, 2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/16/2014. (jsmit )
May 15, 2014 Filing 27 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Disclosures by Plaintiff Harry Harden. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Stevens, David)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO COMPLY WITH D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2, in all court filings, as toany information to be submitted under restriction based on the #25 Protective Order, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/2/2014. (jsmit)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PROTECTIVE ORDER re #24 :, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/2/2014. (jsmit)
May 1, 2014 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order Entry for Deposition of Daniel MacEachen by Defendant Krabloonik, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - (Proposed) Protective Order)(Strauss, Mary)
October 29, 2013 Filing 23 Courtroom Minutes for Scheduling Conference held on 10/29/2013 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. FTR: K. Terasaki. (rpmcd )
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/1/2014 and Dispositive Motions due by 11/1/2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/29/2013. (rpmcd)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER Resetting re #19 : Scheduling Conference for 10/29/2013 at 10:30 AM in Conference Room, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/9/2013. (rpmcd)
September 24, 2013 Filing 20 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Krabloonik, Incorporated.(Strauss, Mary)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/11/2013 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on October 3, 2013 and lead counsel present. Initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar days before the scheduling conference, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/10/2013. (rpmcd )
September 10, 2013 Filing 18 Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 9/10/2013 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #12 , is granted with respect to plaintiffs CCPA (Sixth) claim for relief and denied in all other respects. Scheduling Conference set October 11, 2013 at 2:00 p.m. FTR: K. Terasaki. (rpmcd)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Minute ORDER Setting Hearing #12 MOTION to Dismiss for 9/10/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom A, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/2/2013. (rpmcd)
July 29, 2013 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Krabloonik, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit C - Danielson v Wal-Mart Stores Inc)(Strauss, Mary)
July 15, 2013 Filing 15 Conventionally Submitted Material : EXHIBIT 2 DVD Safety Video to Response to Motion to Dismiss #13 by Defendant Krabloonik, Incorporated (Placed in an envelope and placed in Oversized Documents. Text Only Entry (ervsl, )
July 12, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE to File Exhibit Conventionally by Plaintiffs Harry Harden, Melody Harden (Stevens, David)
July 12, 2013 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiffs Harry Harden, Melody Harden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Stevens, David)
June 21, 2013 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Krabloonik, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Strauss, Mary)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond re #9 Amended Complaint Krabloonik, Incorporated answer due 6/21/2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/14/2013.(ervsl, )
June 14, 2013 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #9 Amended Complaint by Defendant Krabloonik, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Strauss, Mary)
May 31, 2013 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Melody Harden, Harry Harden.(Stevens, David)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint Krabloonik, Incorporated answer due 5/31/2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/29/2013.(rpmcd )
May 28, 2013 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint by Defendant Krabloonik, Incorporated. (Strauss, Mary)
May 23, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark C. Overturf on behalf of Krabloonik, Incorporated (Overturf, Mark)
May 23, 2013 Filing 5 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Krabloonik, Incorporated. Krabloonik, Incorporated answer due 5/28/2013. (Strauss, Mary)
May 8, 2013 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Krabloonik, Incorporated served on 5/2/2013, answer due 5/23/2013. (Stevens, David)
March 12, 2013 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued. No summons issued. (sphil, )
March 12, 2013 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Richard P. Matsch and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (sphil, )
March 12, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 350, Receipt Number 1082-3266162), filed by Harden Melody, Harry Harden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Stevens, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harden et al v. Krabloonik, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Harden
Represented By: David John Stevens
Represented By: David P. Hersh
Represented By: Jacob M. Burg
Represented By: Jacob C. Eisenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody Harden
Represented By: David John Stevens
Represented By: David P. Hersh
Represented By: Jacob M. Burg
Represented By: Jacob C. Eisenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krabloonik, Incorporated
Represented By: Mark C. Overturf
Represented By: Mary Kathryn Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?