Edlund Electric, Inc. v. Tower I Construction Company et al
Plaintiff: Edlund Electric Inc.
Defendant: Western Surety Company and Tower I Construction Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv00665
Filed: March 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, all parties to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/7/2014. (jsmit )
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 3/11/2014. ORDERED: 50 Motion for Sanctions is GRANTED. Mr. Ekstrom's deposition shall be reopened at Defendants' expen se and completed within two weeks of today's date. ORDERED: Plaintiff is permitted to submit a bill of costs for the filing of the Motion for Sanctions within two weeks of today's date. ORDERED: A Settlement Conference is set for 3/21/2014 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Confidential settlement statements due no later than noon on 3/19/2014. ORDERED: The Final Pretrial Conference is RESET to 4/15/2014 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (ccovi)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Denying 19 Motion to Consolidate, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/24/2013.(rpmcd)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/16/2013 10:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 03/20/13. (jjhsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edlund Electric, Inc. v. Tower I Construction Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Represented By: James W. Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tower I Construction Company
Represented By: James W. Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edlund Electric Inc.
Represented By: Robert Reiny Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?