Barnes v. Colvin

Defendant: Carolyn Colvin
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Plaintiff: Kenneth D. Barnes
Case Number: 1:2013cv00763
Filed: March 25, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 2412. Plaintiff is AWARDED attorney fees of $6,169.45 by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/24/14.(jhawk, )
March 21, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court Final JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Kenneth D. Barnes against Carolyn Colvin re: 17 Order by Clerk on 3/21/2014. (klyon, )
March 20, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Reversing Disability Decision and Remanding to Commissioner. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/20/2014. (klyon, )
June 17, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 7/29/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 8/28/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 9/12/2013. By Judge John L. Kane on 6/17/13. (mnfsl, )
March 26, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave by Judge John L. Kane on 3/26/13.(sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth D. Barnes
Represented By: Ann J. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?