Ross v. Gallegos

Plaintiff: Delaree Ross
Defendant: David Gallegos
Case Number: 1:2013cv00831
Filed: April 1, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Motion for Time to File Amended Complaint; granting 9 Motion to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/15/2013.(skl)
July 12, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/12/2013. (skl)
December 3, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 25 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Defendant's Motion To Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) [# 20 ] is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims against defendant are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Judgment SHALL ENTER on behalf of defendant, David Gallegos, Aurora P.O., against plaintiff, Delaree Ross, a/k/a Delise Ross, on all claims for reliefand causes of action. Defendant is AWARDED his costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/3/2013.(klyon, )
December 4, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of David Gallegos against Delaree Ross re: 27 Order, by Clerk on 12/4/2013. (klyon, )
May 9, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/09/2013.(skl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delaree Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.