Fiber, LLC v. Ciena Corporation, et al

Plaintiff: Fiber, LLC
Defendant: Ciena Communications, Inc. and Ciena Corporation
Counter_claimant: Ciena Communications, Inc. and Ciena Corporation
Counter_defendant: Fiber, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv00840
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2016 101 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/22/16. (sgrim)
April 5, 2016 90 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/5/2016. Motion for Entry of Confidentiality and Protective Order # 75 and Defendants' Brief in Support of Proposed Protective Order # 77 are TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. FTR: KLM Courtroom A401. (lgale, )
April 4, 2016 89 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER; 85 Finisar Corporations (Finisar) UnopposedMotion for Finisar Corporation to Intervene as a Defendant Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 24 is GRANTED. Finisar is permitted to intervene pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(b)(1)(B). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Finisar shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before April 18, 2016, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/4/16.(morti, )
March 15, 2016 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/15/16. Motion for Leave to File a Response to Plaintiff Fiber LLC's Motion for Entry of Protective Order (Doc. 75); or, in the Alternative, to Strike Fiber LLC's Improper Response # 81 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2016 1:30 PM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (lgale, )
February 1, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/1/16. (lgale, )
November 16, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases 53 is granted. That pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) and D.C.COLO.LCivR. 42.1, Civil Action Nos. 13-cv-00840-PAB-KLM and 15-cv-01743-PAB shall be consolidated for all pre-trial matters up to, but not including, the final pretrial conference. The Clerk of the Court shall reassign Civil Action No. 15-cv-01743-PAB to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/16/2015.(agarc, )
November 2, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion to Reopen Case. ORDERED that this case is reopened. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/02/15.(jhawk, )
July 19, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 31 Motion to Vacate Deadline to File Proposed Stipulated Protective Order Under Section 9(d)(1) of Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 07/19/13.(jjhsl, )
July 18, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Inter Partes Review of the Patents-in-Suit [Docket No. 29] filed by plaintiff Fiber, LLC and defendants Ciena Corporation and Ciena Communications, Inc. is GRANTED. ORDERED that this case is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pending a showing by either party of good cause in accordance with D.C.Colo.LCivR 41.2 by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 07/18/13. (jjhsl, )
July 2, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Second Joint Motion to Modify Section 9(d)(1) of Scheduling Order. Section 9(d)(1) of the 22 Scheduling Order is amended to state: "The parties will file a proposed Stipulated Protective Order (or separate versions thereof if necessary) on or before July 16, 2013." By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/2/13.(mnfsl, )
June 18, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Joint Motion to Modify Section 9(d)(1) of Scheduling Order. Section 9(d)(1) of the 22 Scheduling Order is amended to state: "The parties will file a proposed Stipulated Protective Order (or separate versions thereof if necessary) on or before June 28, 2013." By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/18/13.(mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fiber, LLC v. Ciena Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiber, LLC
Represented By: Aaron P. Bradford
Represented By: Alexander Christian Clayden
Represented By: George G. Matava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ciena Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Natalie Marie Hanlon-Leh
Represented By: Mary Virginia Sooter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ciena Corporation
Represented By: Natalie Marie Hanlon-Leh
Represented By: Mary Virginia Sooter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Ciena Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Natalie Marie Hanlon-Leh
Represented By: Mary Virginia Sooter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Ciena Corporation
Represented By: Natalie Marie Hanlon-Leh
Represented By: Mary Virginia Sooter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Fiber, LLC
Represented By: Aaron P. Bradford
Represented By: Alexander Christian Clayden
Represented By: George G. Matava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?