XY, LLC v. Trans Ova Genetics, LC

Plaintiff: XY, LLC
Defendant: Trans Ova Genetics, LC
Counter_claimant: Trans Ova Genetics, LC
Counter_defendant: XY, LLC
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Trans Ova Genetics, LC
Thirdparty_defendant: Inguran, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv00876
Filed: April 4, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2016 507 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT. re: 500 , by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/19/2016. (dhans, )
April 8, 2016 500 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON POST-TRIAL MOTIONS. re 467 , 468 , 471 , 472 , 473 , 477 , 479 , 480 , by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/8/2016.(dhans, )
February 12, 2016 448 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Juror Attendance fee. It is ORDERED that the clerk shall pay jurors in the above-entitled case the sum of $50.00 per day beginning on each juror's eleventh day of service and continuing thereafter until service has been completed and jurors are released by the court, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1871(b)(3). Ordered by Judge William J. Martinez on 02/12/2016. (cthom, )
January 22, 2016 417 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 416 Motion for Leave to Restrict Certain Trial Exhibits. Signed by Judge William J. Martinez on 01/22/16.(jhawk, )
January 21, 2016 415 Opinion or Order of the Court Rulings on Objections to Deposition Designations, by Judge William J. Martinez on 01/21/2016. (cthom, )
January 8, 2016 397 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 322 Trans Ovas Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Reports and to Limit Testimony of XY, LLCs Expert Dr. James C.S. Wood; granting in part and denying in part 326 Trans Ovas Motion to Exclude and Limit the Testimony and Report of XY, LLCs Damage Expert Todd Schoettelkotte; denying 330 XYs Motion to Exclude, by Judge William J. Martinez on 01/08/2016.(cthom, )
January 7, 2016 396 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 365 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 367 Motion in Limine, by Judge William J. Martinez on 01/07/2016.(cthom, )
January 5, 2016 393 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Inguran LLC's 334 Motion for Judgment. The Motion is DENIED as to Ingurans request for Rule 54(b) entry of judgment; and The Motion is GRANTED as to Ingurans request for Rule 12(c) judgment on the ple adings as to Trans Ovas third-party claims against Inguran. As no claims against Inguran remain, Third-Party Defendant Inguran, LLC, shall be removed from the case caption in future filings, and Trans Ova shall no longer be referred to as a Third-Party Plaintiff, by Judge William J. Martinez on 01/05/2016.(cthom, )
December 30, 2015 376 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 316 Motion Construe Antitrust Counterclaims as Recoupment Counterclaims as to Inguran. Trans Ova may assert its substantive antitrust claims at trial as a recoupment defense solely against XY, and may seek by way of remedy an offset in an amount no greater than the amount of XYs recovery, should any be awarded, by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/30/2015.(cthom, )
November 12, 2015 335 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; 324 Unopposed Motion For Leave To Restrict Exhibits B, C, D and E to Trans Ova Genetics, L.C.s Daubert Motion to Exclude and Limit the Testimony and Report of XY, LLCs Damage Expert Todd Schoettelkotte is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PA RT. 327 Amended Unopposed Motion For Leave To Restrict Exhibits A, B, D, and E to Trans Ova Genetics, L.C.s Daubert Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Reports and Limit the Testimony and Report of XY, LLCs Damage Expert Dr. James C.S. W ood is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. 328 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Restrict Exhibits A C to Motion of XY, LLC and Inguran, LLC To Exclude Expert Testimony (XY Motion to Restrict) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/12/15.(morti, )
September 23, 2015 315 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 288 Motion for Reconsideration. Trans Ovas Amended Motion to Reconsider Ruling on Counterclaim Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on Antitrust Counterclaims and Request for Oral Argument is DENIED. by Judge William J. Martinez on 09/23/2015.(cthom, )
September 15, 2015 313 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 311 Motion to Withdraw, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 09/14/15.(nmarb, )
August 17, 2015 305 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/17/15 granting 303 Motion to Amend Expert Discovery for Limited Purposes. (bsimm, )
March 26, 2015 284 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Counterclaim Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Antitrust Counterclaims. XY, LLC and Inguran, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment on Statute of Limitations Grounds (ECF No. 229 ) is GRANTED. Trans Ova Genetics, LC� 39;s counterclaims for monopolization and attempted monopolization are barred by the statute of limitations. When judgment is entered, it shall be in favor of XY and Inguran and against Trans Ova as to those claims. By Judge William J. Martinez on 03/26/2015. (athom, )
December 3, 2014 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/3/14. The Motion for Discovery 254 is GRANTED; Trans Ova shall produce its HSR Act 4(c) submission, on or before 12/10/2014; and XY, may reopen the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of Trans Ova to inquire further about Trans Ova's HSR Act 4(c) filing and related matters. (bsimm, )
October 7, 2014 272 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the Court hereby ADOPTS Plaintiffs constructions of the disputed terms and phrases, by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/7/2014. (evana, )
September 15, 2014 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Defendants Early Partial Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 51 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; The Motion is GRANTED as to Plaintiffs Breach of Contract Claim to the extent that it accrued before March 6, 2009; and The Motion is DENIED in all other respects., by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/15/2014.(evana, )
September 5, 2014 260 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 244 Trans Ovas Motion to File Reply, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/5/2014.(evana, )
July 14, 2014 222 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 220 the Unopposed Motion for Leave to Serve and Pursue Limited Discovery on Late-Arising Issue Relating to Trans Ova Genetics L.C.s Monopolization Counterclaims, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/14/2014.(evana, )
May 5, 2014 197 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 195 the Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Trans Ova Genetics, L.C.s Motion to Compel Document Production, and 184 DENIED AS WITHDRAWN MOTION to Compel; and the hearing set for May 8, 2014, is VACATED, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/5/2014.(evana, )
April 25, 2014 190 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS re: Markman Hearing, by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/25/2014. (dhans, )
March 31, 2014 172 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 170 the Joint Motion to Modify Discovery Deadlines. The parties shall designate all experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before May 16, 2014; The parties shall designate all rebuttal experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before June 13, 2014; All written discovery must be served by: June 10, 2014; Discovery Cut- Off: July 11, 2014, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/31/2014.(evana, )
December 18, 2013 122 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 120 the Unopposed Motion to File Corrected Answer, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/18/2013.(ervsl, )
November 21, 2013 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 110 Plaintiffs Corrected Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept for filing the Second Amended Complaint Doc. # [110-1]. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/21/2013.(ervsl, ) (Main (Modified on 11/21/2013 attached correct PDF Order)(ervsl, ).
October 2, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/2/13. (bnbcd, )
August 16, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/18/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/16/13. (bnbcd, )
July 3, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requesting a Ststus Report. The Parties are to jointly file the Status Report by no later than July 15, 2013 at 12:00 noon. Such filing shall not to exceed six pages in length exclusive of the caption page, attorney signature blocks and certificate of service, by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/3/2013. (ervsl, )
June 12, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 Joint Motion to Adopt Confidentiality and Protective Order Entered in Western District of Texas. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/12/13.(bnbcd, )
June 6, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 1 Case Transferred In - District Transfer, Plaintiff XY, LLCs Motions to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and Motion for More Definite Inguran LLCs Motions to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and Motion for More Definite Statement Under Rule 12(e) Doc. # [1-99] is DENIED without prejudice as moot; XYs and Ingurans Motion to Stay [Doc. # [1-127] is DENIED without prejudice as moot; and (4) XY, LLCs Objections to the Magistrate Judges Report and Recommendation Doc. # [1-93] is DENIED as withdrawn, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/6/2013. (ervsl, )
April 12, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed scheduling order due by 5/30/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/12/13. (bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: XY, LLC v. Trans Ova Genetics, LC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XY, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Lynn Moffett
Represented By: Kirt Stephen O'Neill
Represented By: George Andrew Lever Rosbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Ova Genetics, LC
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Jowers
Represented By: Donald Earl Lake, III
Represented By: George G. Matava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Trans Ova Genetics, LC
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Jowers
Represented By: Donald Earl Lake, III
Represented By: George G. Matava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: XY, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Lynn Moffett
Represented By: Kirt Stephen O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Trans Ova Genetics, LC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Inguran, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?