Barnes v. Amerigas Propane, Inc.
Plaintiff: Herbert Barnes
Defendant: Amerigas Propane, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00916
Filed: April 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Gunnison
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 34 the parties' Stipulated Motion to dismiss with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorneys fees, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/15/2013.(ervsl, )
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Denying 25 Motion to Compel, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/4/2013.(rpmcd)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 28 Motion for Leave to Amend Scheduling Order 16 : the deadline to designate experts and reports is October 15, 2013, the deadline to designate contradicting experts and reports is October 29, 2013, and the deadline for rebuttal opinions to be exchanged is November 12, 2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/16/2013.(rpmcd) Modified on 9/17/2013 (rpmcd).
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 20 Motion for Leave: the amended complaint tendered as Document 21 is accepted for filing, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/9/2013.(rpmcd )
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Motion To Extend Deadline re 16 : to and including July 8, 2013, to join parties or amend pleadings, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/27/2013.(rpmcd)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/14/2013 at 02:30 PM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on May 9, 2013, lead counsel present in person, and no parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/11/2013. (rpmcd)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Amended ORDER Setting Status Conference by NONE on 04/09/2013. (dbera, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Amerigas Propane, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Barnes
Represented By: David Lichtenstein
Represented By: Ariel Beryl DeFazio
Represented By: Jon R. Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerigas Propane, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?