IOMOUNTS LLC v. Magfoot, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: IOMOUNTS LLC
Defendant: Magfoot, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01055
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Pitkin
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Unfair Competition (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINAL JUDGMENT re: 27 Order Granting Permanent Injuction. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/27/2014. (shart)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Stipulated Motion for Entry of Injunction and Dismissal by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/23/14. This case is dismissed with prejudice.(dkals, )
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed scheduling order due by 7/25/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/6/13. (bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IOMOUNTS LLC v. Magfoot, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IOMOUNTS LLC
Represented By: J. Mark Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magfoot, Inc.
Represented By: Eric William Cernyar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?