Gilley v. Advance Merchandizing Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: Steven Gilley
Defendant: Advance Stores Company, Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2013cv01099
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/12/13. (cbssec)
July 8, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/8/13. (msksec, )
May 21, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 7/8/2013 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/21/13. (cbssec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilley v. Advance Merchandizing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Gilley
Represented By: Donna E. Dell'Olio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Stores Company, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?