Small v. BOKF, N.A.

Plaintiff: Leland Small
Defendant: BOKF, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01125
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2016 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 181 the parties' Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Memorandum in SupportThereof; granting 182 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Award and Memorandum in Support. This Action is hereby dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/31/16.(kfinn)
October 8, 2015 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 177 Parties' Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement and Notice to Class. Final Fairness Hearing set for 3/25/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/8/2015.(mlace, )
August 28, 2015 170 Opinion or Order of the Court FOURTH TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER Two (2) day Bench Trial set for 9/16/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 8/28/2015 at 01:30 AM before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/28/2015. (mlace, )
June 9, 2015 155 Opinion or Order of the Court THIRD TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/9/15. A Bench Trial is set for 9/16/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. A combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference is set for 8/28/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (dkals, )
May 27, 2015 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating the Final Pretrial Conference/Trial Preparation Conference, and the trial, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/27/15. A telephonic setting conference is set for 6/9/2015 10:00 AM before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (dkals, )
May 21, 2015 152 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 150 Unopposed Motion to Vacate Jury Trial in Favor of Bench Trial. If the parties seek a nonjury trial, they may file the stipulation required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 39(a)(1) by 5/26/2015. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/21/2015. (alowe)
February 25, 2015 149 Opinion or Order of the Court THIRD TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: 3-Day Jury Trial set for 6/29/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for 6/12/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/25/215. (alowe)
February 12, 2015 148 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. Ordered that Plaintiff's Combined Motion for Jury Trial and Brief in Support [#146], filed February 10, 2015, is GRANTED. Ordered that Defendant BOKF, NA's Motion Pursuant to Court's Order of January 13, 2015 [Doc. 145] a nd Combined Brief in Support [#147], filed February 10, 2015, is GRANTED. Ordered a telephonic setting conference to schedule the combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference as well as the trial IS SET for Wednesday, February 25, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel with scheduling authority for both parties are to contact the court's Judicial Assistant at the time and date of the setting conference. Entered by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 02/12/15.(jhawk, )
December 22, 2014 144 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 143 Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Telephonic Setting Conference. Telephone Conference reset for 1/13/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/22/2014.(alowe)
August 8, 2014 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion to Certify Class, as outlined in the attached order, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/8/2014.(trlee, )
August 7, 2014 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion for Summary Judgment and granting in part and denying in part 102 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, as outlined in the attached order. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/7/2014.(trlee, )
July 23, 2014 133 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/31/2015. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set 8/7/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Ten (10) day Jury Trial set 8/10/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/23/14. (rebsec)
July 2, 2014 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/2/2014. (trlee, ) Modified on 7/2/2014 to reflect that this does not belong in this case, please disregard . (trlee, ).
February 13, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 45 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 83 Motion for Leave, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/13/2014.(trlee, )
October 31, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 69 BOKF's Combined Expedited Mtoion for Stay of Certification Issue pending Ruling on Motion for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support. Defendant SHALL FILE a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Memorandum in Support [# 57 ], by 11/15/2013. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/31/2013.(klyon, )
July 12, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/12/2013. (mjwcd)
June 25, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Motions for Class Certification. No later than 8/15/2013, the plaintiff SHALL FILE a motion for class certification. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/25/2013. (klyon, )
June 24, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER. Jury Trial set for 8/25/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 8/8/2014 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/24/13. (rebcd)
April 29, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 6/24/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/29/2013. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Small v. BOKF, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leland Small
Represented By: Christopher David Dandurand
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Norman Eli Siegel
Represented By: Stephen Newton Six
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOKF, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?