Berry v. City of Montrose, Colorado et al.
Plaintiff: |
Robert Scott Berry |
Defendant: |
Michael L. Watson, Larry Abeyta, Gary Coram and City of Montrose, Colorado |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv01138 |
Filed: |
April 29, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Montrose |
Presiding Judge: |
Philip A. Brimmer |
Presiding Judge: |
Kathleen M. Tafoya |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 17, 2015 |
Filing
36
AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT. Pursuant to the Orders [Docket Nos. 30 and 35] of United States District Judge Philip A. Brimmer entered on March 12, 2014 and March 16, 2015, it is ORDERED that defendant Gary Coram's FED.R.CIV.P. 12(b)(6) Motion to Dis miss [Docket No. 17] is GRANTED in PART. Plaintiff's third and fourth claims are dismissed without prejudice. ORDERED: Motion to Dismiss [Docket No. 19] filed by defendants City of Montrose, Michael L. Watson, and Lenny Abeyta is GRANTED in PART. Plaintiff's first and second claims for relief are dismissed with prejudice by Clerk on 3/17/15. (kpreu)
|
March 16, 2015 |
Filing
35
ORDER. ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion to Modify/Correct Order of Dismissal [Docket No. 34] is GRANTED. ORDERED that plaintiffs first claim for relief is dismissed with prejudice by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/16/15.(jhawk, )
|
March 14, 2014 |
Filing
31
FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDERED that judgment is hereby entered in favor of defendants CITY OF MONTROSE, MICHAEL L. WATSON, LARRY ABEYTA, and GARY CORAM. ORDERED that defendants are AWARDED their costs, to be taxed by the Clerk of the Court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1. ORDERED that this case is CLOSED by Clerk on 03//14/14. (jhawk, )
|
March 12, 2014 |
Filing
30
ORDER. ORDERED that Gary Coram's FED.R.CIV.P. 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss 17 is GRANTED in part. Mr. Berry's third and fourth claims are dismissed without prejudice. ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss 19 filed by defendants City of Mo ntrose, Michael L. Watson, and Lenny Abeyta is GRANTED in part. Plaintiff's first claim for relief is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's second claim for relief is dismissed. ORDERED that this case is CLOSED by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/12/14.(jhawk, )
|
September 12, 2013 |
Filing
29
ORDER granting 26 Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay. All discovery in this matter is hereby stayed pending ruling on 17 , 19 Defendants' Motions toDismiss. The parties shall file a joint status report within seven days of a ruling on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, if any portion of the case remains pending, to advise if the stay should be lifted. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/12/13.(mnfsl, )
|
July 3, 2013 |
Filing
18
AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 8/14/2013 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/3/13. (sgrim)
|
May 9, 2013 |
Filing
7
ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order on or before 7/29/13, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/9/13. (sgrim)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?