Adema Technologies, Inc v. Eiffert et al

Plaintiff: Adema Technologies, Inc
Defendant: Patricia Eiffert and Imaginit, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01139
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Conversion
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2015 129 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant Patrina Eiffert and against Plaintiff Adema Technologies, Inc by Clerk on 9/9/215. (vbarn)
August 4, 2015 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 75 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims based on alter ego against both ImaginIt and Dr. Eiffert are DISMISSED with prejudice. All claims against ImaginIt Inc. are DISMISSED with prejudice. As a result of this ruling, the only counts remaining for trial by a jury are Counts 1 and 2 as against Defendant Patrina Eiffert. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 08/04/2015. (athom, )
May 7, 2015 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. By no later than 6/6/2015, the parties are to file simultaneous briefing addressing the three prongs set forth above with evidentiary and legal support for the argument as to whether or not it is appropriate for this Court to pierce the corp orate veil, i.e., whether SFW is an alter ego of ImaginIt and whether Imaginit is an alter ego of Ms. Eiffert. The Final Trial Preparation Conference set for 5/11/2015 at 1:00 PM, and the Trial beginning on 5/26/2015, are VACATED. Parties are DIRECTED to email Chambers (arguello_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov) on or before 6/8/2015, to reset trial dates. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 05/07/2015. (athom, )
April 23, 2015 96 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 91 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 04/23/2015. (athom, )
April 15, 2015 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. It is ORDERED that Defendants file a Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment within 14 days of this Order. Plaintiff shall have 7 days following Defendants' Response to file its Reply. Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Motion (Doc. # 76 ) is DENIED. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 04/15/2015. (athom, )
November 10, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/10/14 granting 71 Motion for Leave to Participate by Telephone in the Pre-Trial Conference. (bsimm, )
September 16, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 63 Motion to Strike. The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept for filing the defendants' Answer [Doc. # 62 ]. Discovery due by 10/31/2014. The Final Pretrial Conference set 10/1/2014, at 10:00 AM, isVACATED and RESET to 11/13/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. A Final Pretrial Order shall be prepared by the parties and submitted to the court no later than 11/62014. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/16/2014. (athom, )
April 10, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/10/14. Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery 29 is GRANTED. The Motion to Comple 30 is DENIED as moot. The Motion to Withdraw 34 is DENIED as withdrawn. (bsimm)
March 19, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting in Part and Rejecting in Part 46 Report and Recommendations, and denying 8 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint or, in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/19/14.(dkals, )
January 2, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/2/14. (mnfsl, )
May 10, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed scheduling order due by 7/15/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/10/13. (bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adema Technologies, Inc v. Eiffert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adema Technologies, Inc
Represented By: Douglas D. Koktavy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Eiffert
Represented By: Robert James Shilliday, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imaginit, Inc.
Represented By: Robert James Shilliday, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?