Weitz Company, LLC, The et al v. Capitol Peak Lodge Condominium Association, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Base Village Owner, LLC, LaFarge West, Inc., Baker Concrete Construction, Inc. and Weitz Company, LLC, The |
Defendant: |
Capitol Peak Lodge Condominium Association, Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv01179 |
Filed: |
May 3, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert E. Blackburn |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael J. Watanabe |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 22, 2013 |
Filing
50
JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Capitol Peak Lodge Condominium Association, Inc. against Baker Concrete Construction, Inc., Base Village Owner, LLC, LaFarge West, Inc., Weitz Company, LLC, The re: 49 Order, by Clerk on 11/22/2013. (klyon, )
|
August 9, 2013 |
Filing
42
TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/28/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 4/4/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Two (2) day Bench Trial set for 4/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/9/13. (rebsec, )
|
May 29, 2013 |
Filing
11
MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Unopposed Motion for Leave to file Amended Complaint Under Restricted Access Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/29/2013.(klyon, )
|
May 7, 2013 |
Filing
5
ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/26/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/7/2013. (mjwcd)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Weitz Company, LLC, The et al v. Capitol Peak Lodge Condominium Association, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Base Village Owner, LLC |
Represented By: |
John Patrick Box, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: LaFarge West, Inc. |
Represented By: |
John Patrick Box, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Baker Concrete Construction, Inc. |
Represented By: |
John Patrick Box, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Weitz Company, LLC, The |
Represented By: |
John Patrick Box, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Capitol Peak Lodge Condominium Association, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Peter W. Thomas, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?