Claypool v. Thompson et al

Defendant: Bruce R. Thompson and Bank of America N/A
Plaintiff: George Leonard Claypool
Case Number: 1:2013cv01180
Filed: May 3, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Mesa
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Defendants BANK OF AMERICA N/A and Bruce R. Thompson against Plaintiff George Leonard Claypool, re: 8 Order. Entered by Clerk on June 6th, 2013. (ebutl)
May 17, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by or before Friday, 6/14/2013. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/17/13. (mnfsl, )
June 5, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The 1 Complaint for Damages is dismissed. This case is dismissed. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/5/13. (mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Claypool v. Thompson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce R. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N/A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Leonard Claypool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.