Macieyovski v. City and County of Denver

Plaintiff: Vincent Macieyovski
Defendant: City and County of Denver
Case Number: 1:2013cv01186
Filed: May 6, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion to Amend Complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept the attached Second Amended Complaint for filing by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/07/13.(jjhsl, )
May 29, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Upon review of the Final 25 Pretrial Order, I find that this case is ripe for a trial setting. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that a three-day jury trial shall commence on Monday, April 13, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-1002. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a Trial Preparation Conference is set for Thursday, March 19, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-1002. by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/29/2014. (evana, )
March 30, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 City 's Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/30/2015.(evana, )
May 30, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/27/2013 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/30/13. (jjhsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Macieyovski v. City and County of Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Macieyovski
Represented By: Mark S. Bove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.