Medina v. Catholic Health Initiatives et al
Plaintiff: Janeen Medina
Defendant: Catholic Health Initiatives, Patricia G. Webb and Carol Keenan
Case Number: 1:2013cv01249
Filed: May 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER That Plaintiff's Motion for Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs 428 , filed March 22, 2016, is granted in part and denied in part as follows: That the motion is granted to the extent it challenges the award of $75,516.35 in costs for data processing, and those costs are disallowed; and That in all other respects, the motion is denied; and That defendants are awarded costs in the amount of $62,278.50, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/17/2017. (evana, )
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 382 JUDGMENT by Clerk: in favor of Andrea J. Lee, Antoinette Hardy-Waller, Barbara Hagedorn, Christopher R. Lowney, David R. Edwards, David R. Lincoln, Dean Swindle, Donald Jones, Edward Speed, Eleanor F. Martin, Geraldine Bednash, James Hamill, Katheri ne Gray, Kevin E. Lofton, Lillian Murphy, Mary Jo Potter, Mary Margaret Mooney, Maureen Comer, Patricia Smith, Patricia G. Webb, Phyllis Hughes, Richard Corrente against Janeen Medina re: Order Re: Motions for Summary Judgment 381 . By Clerk on 12/8/15. (kfinn)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER denying 306 Motion of the Catholic Health Association of the United States for Leave To Participate as Amicus Curiae. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/7/2015.(mlace, )
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER denying 243 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/13/2015.(alowe)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER denying 254 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) and Request for Stay of Proceedings Pending Appeal in Light of Recent Decisions. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/12/2105. (alowe)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/10/14. Defendants' Limited Motion for Reconsideration of Discovery Dispute Order [# 228 ] is DENIED without prejudice. (lgale, )
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER denying 227 Motion to Certify Order Pursuant to 28 USC § 1292(b), and Request for a Stay of Proceedings Pending Appeal. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/27/2014.(alowe)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 238 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/11/2015. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set 12/18/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Fifteen (15) day Bench Trial set 1/4/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/17/14. (rebsec)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER: That the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 210 , filed August 13, 2014, is APPROVED and ADOPTED IN PART and, respectfully, REJECTED IN PART. Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint With Memorandum in Support 123 , filed December 23, 2013, is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/30/2014.(trlee, )
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER denying 121 Motion to Certify Class, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/26/2014.(trlee, )
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting 204 Motion to Stay discovery as outlined in the attached order, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/18/2014.(trlee, )
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/8/14 regarding discovery disputes. (lgale)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MINUTE ORDER granting 182 Defendants' Motion Requesting Oral Argument on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. A Motion Hearing is SET for June 24, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom C-204 of the Byron G. Rogers U nited States Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The purpose of the hearing is for the parties to offer argument regarding: (1) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint with Memorandum in Support [# 123 ] and (2) Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [# 140 ]. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/14/2014. (klyon, )
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/7/14 Granting 177 Plaintiff's Motion to Request Oral Argument. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall jointly call the Court at (303) 335-2770 on or before May 14, 2014 to schedule the hearing. (lgale)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER of Dismissal as to Plaintiff, Rhett J. Dudley, Only. The Stipulation of Dismissal of Plaintiff Rhett J. Dudley's, Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) [#120] filed December 23, 2013, is APPROVED. The claims of the plaintiff, Rhett J. Dudley, against the defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff, Rhett J. Dudley, is DROPPED as a named party to this action, and the case caption is amended accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/28/2014. (klyon, )
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER of Dismissal as to Plaintiff, Aric B. Fowler, Only. The Stipulation of Dismissal of Plaintiff Aric B. Fowler, Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) [# 136 ] filed January 24, 2014, is APPROVED. The claims of plaintiff, Aric B. Fowler, against the defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff, Aric B. Fowler, is DROPPED as a named party to this action, and the case caption is amended accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/27/2014. (klyon, )
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER of Dismissal as to Defendant Carol Keenan, Only. The Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Carol Keenan [# 119 ] is APPROVED. Plaintiffs' claims against defendant, Carol Keenan, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendant, Carol Keenan, is DROPPED as a named party to this action, and the case caption is amended accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/31/2013. (klyon, )
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MINUTE ORDER granting 111 Unopposed Motion to Set Deadline for Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint [# 82 ] on or before 12/23/2013. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/3/2013.(klyon, )
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 57 Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel and Supporting Memorandum. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/31/2013.(klyon, )
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/3/2013. (trlee, )
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 23 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss withMemorandum in Support and 41 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time and to Enlarge Page Limit. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/15/2013.(klyon, )
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re: Motions for Class Certification. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/8/2013. (klyon, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medina v. Catholic Health Initiatives et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Health Initiatives
Represented By: Lars C. Golumbic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia G. Webb
Represented By: Lars C. Golumbic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Keenan
Represented By: Lars C. Golumbic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janeen Medina
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?