Todd v. County Court
Defendant: The Attorney General of the State of Colorado and County of Larimer County Court
Petitioner: Isaac Todd
Case Number: 1:2013cv01264
Filed: May 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Final JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of The Attorney General of the State of Colorado, County of Larimer County Court against Isaac Todd re: 32 Order by Clerk on 3/26/2014. (klyon, )
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Suspend Briefing andto Compel the Filing of a Complete Trial Court Record. The Motion is granted to the extent that Applicant may file a traverse to the Respondents Answer [# 22 ] on or before 11/1/2013. The Motion is denied as moot to the extent it seeks to compel the filing of a complete trial record. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/2/2013.(klyon, )
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for State Court Record and to Answer, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/24/2013. (skl)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/28/13, To File Pre-Answer Response. ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order Respondent The Attorney General of the State of Colorado shall file a Pre-Answer Response that complies with this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days of the filing of the Pre-Answer Response Applicant may file a Reply. (nmmsl, )
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Petitioner to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/15/2013. (skl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd v. County Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Attorney General of the State of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Larimer County Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Isaac Todd
Represented By: Sarah Jay Schielke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?