Gregg v. N.A.R., Inc
Plaintiff: Shane Gregg
Defendant: N.A.R., Inc
Case Number: 1:2013cv01313
Filed: May 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees 16 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as indicated in this Order. ORDERED that plaintiff SHANE GREGG shall be awarded $4694 in attorney's fees by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/12/14.(jhawk, )
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: 21 MOTION for Protective Order is GRANTED. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/3/13. (bnbcd, )
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JUDGMENT Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.68 by Clerk re: 13 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment, by Clerk on 7/15/2013. (klyon, )
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/10/13. (mnfsl, )
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed scheduling order due by 7/18/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/4/13. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregg v. N.A.R., Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Gregg
Represented By: Matthew R. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.A.R., Inc
Represented By: Steven J. Wienczkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?