Goodman v. USA
Petitioner: Laurence R. Goodman
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2013cv01369
Filed: May 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Gilpin
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 42 and 43 Motions for Leave To Make a Statement Likely To Manifest a Specific Cause of Action. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/21/2013.(klyon, )
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of USA against Laurence R. Goodman re: 40 Order on Recommendation, by Clerk on 10/16/2013. (klyon, )
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying 22 Objection to Order Denying Plaintiffs Motion forDisqualification of District Judge Robert E. Blackburn and denying as moot 23 Objection to Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Disqualification of District Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/10/2013. (klyon, )
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Disqualification of District JudgeRobert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/2/2013.(klyon, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodman v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Laurence R. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Aaron Michael Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?