USA v. Rye
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Glendora R. Rye
Case Number: 1:2013cv01372
Filed: May 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Property Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying 41 Motion to Oppose Writ of Entry & Amend Date of Settlement Agreement, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/13/2014.(trlee, ) (Main Document 42 replaced to correct a typo on 2/14/2014) (trlee, ).
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 WRIT OF ENTRY re: 39 Motion for Writ, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/4/2014.(trlee, )
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 36 Motion for Order for consent judgment. by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/12/2013.(trlee, )
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Re: Appointment and Entry of Judgment. 18 Defendant's Request for Court Appointed Counsel is GRANTED, and Defendant's Request to Offset is, as set forth below, interpreted as a motion to set aside the entry of default, is GRANTED only as to that limited relief. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 08/29/13. (alvsl)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 8/14/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 05/31/13. (alvsl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glendora R. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Amanda Adams Rocque
Represented By: Johanna Hamburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?