Watson v. Cozza-Rhodes et al
Plaintiff: Pierre Terron-O'neal Watson
Defendant: Jeff George, Ed Vincent, Dan Clark, T. K. Cozza-Rhodes, Romine and Miranda Avalos
Case Number: 1:2013cv01456
Filed: June 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Final JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 43 Order, by Clerk on 4/11/2014. (klyon, )
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Accepting 39 Magistrate Judge's Recommendation. Defendants George, Cozza-Rhodes and Avalos's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Issue of Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies [Docket No. 33 ] is GRANTED, and the claims against defendants George, Cozza-Rhodes, and Avalos are dismissed without prejudice. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/10/2014.(klyon, )
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/24/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/19/2013. (mjwcd)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/13/13. (dkals, )
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SECOND ORDER Directing Plaintiff To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/27/13. (nmmsl, )
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/12/13. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Cozza-Rhodes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. K. Cozza-Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miranda Avalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierre Terron-O'neal Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?