TCYK, LLC v. Does 1-20
Plaintiff: TCYK, LLC
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Case Number: 1:2013cv01461
Filed: June 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER. ORDERED that John Doe 18 and this action are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/27/13. (jjhsl, )
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER. ORDERED that John Does 8, 9, 11, 13, 14, 15, and 19 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/26/13. (jjhsl, )
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. ORDERED that John Doe Nos. 6 and 17 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/12/13. (jjhsl, )
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. ORDERED that John Doe Nos. 2 and 3 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and John Doe No. 20 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/01/13. (jjhsl, )
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. ORDERED that John Doe No. 4 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 09/09/13. (jjhsl, )
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. ORDERED that John Doe No. 10 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 09/04/13. (jjhsl, )
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. ORDERED that John Doe 12 and 16 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/30/2013. (trlee, )
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. ORDERED that Defendants John Doe 1 and 7 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/06/13. (jjhsl, )
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. ORDERED that Defendant John Doe 5 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 06/18/13. (jjhsl, )
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 8 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Limited Expedited Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/11/2013. (mehcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TCYK, LLC v. Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TCYK, LLC
Represented By: David John Stephenson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?