Etheredge et al v. Allegra Network, LLC
Plaintiff: Donna Driscoll and Mance Etheredge
Defendant: Allegra Network, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv01462
Filed: June 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/7/14.(rbjcd, )
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Re: 23 Stipulated MOTION to Join Allegra Holding, LLC as a Defendant. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 09/30/13. (alvsl)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE This matter has been scheduled for a three-day bench trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on June 16, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for May 15, 2014 at 8:00 a.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 08/20/2013. (rbjsec. )
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 06/10/2013. (rbjsec )
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Response to Delay Reduction / Show Cause Order. by J. Mark Hannen, District Court Judge on 05/03/2013. (dbera, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Etheredge et al v. Allegra Network, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegra Network, LLC
Represented By: Michele On-Ja Choe
Represented By: Kimberly Briggs Still
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Driscoll
Represented By: Michael Graeme McKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mance Etheredge
Represented By: Michael Graeme McKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?