Mabie v. Daniels
Defendant: C. Daniels
Petitioner: William Mabie
Case Number: 1:2013cv01489
Filed: June 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of C. Daniels against William Mabie re: 34 Order Dismissing Case, by Clerk on 1/31/2014. (klyon, )
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The Petition for Restoration of "Good Time" Due to Lack of Due Process [# 1 ], filed June 10, 2013, and the Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241 [# 6 ], filed July 7, 2013, by Applicant William J. Mabie are considered together and are DENIED. This case is DISMISSED. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/29/2014. (klyon, )
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 26 Motion to Reconsider. The request in the alternative that the motion be considered as a notice of appeal is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/5/2013.(klyon, )
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER of Dismissal in Part and for Answer. Applicant's Motion for Sanction, ECF No. 19 , is construed as a Reply. The claims regarding Incident Report Nos. 2315657 and 2238883 are dismissed. Respondent show cause within twenty-one days from the date of this Order why the Application, with respect to the claims associated with Incident Report Nos. 2245782, 2242146, 2241658, 2240669, and 2239324, should not be granted. Within twenty-one days of Respondent's answer to the Order to Show Cause Applicant may file a reply. Applicant shall remain in custody until further order. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/24/2013.(klyon, )
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/21/13. (nmmsl, )
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER denying 15 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/11/2013. Motion for Summary Judgment is construed as a Motion for Default Judgment. (skl)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Applicant To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/11/13. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mabie v. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Mabie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?