May v. U.S. Bank N.A. et al
Plaintiff: James Gregory May
Defendant: Robert (I) J. Aronowitz, Lisa Cancanon, Robert J. Aronowitz, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank N.A. and Lisa (I) Cancanon
Case Number: 1:2013cv01621
Filed: June 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. The 46 Motion by Plaintiff to Voluntarily Dismiss With Prejudice is granted. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a), this matter, and all claims asserted therein, is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/27/13.(mnfsl, )
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Status Conference held on 8/21/2013. Deadline for Plaintiff to file written Response to "Aronowitz & Mecklenburg defendants"Motion to Dismi ss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and (6) 16 is 9/11/2013. Deadline for defendants to file Reply is 9/20/2013. Deadline for Plaintiff to file written Response to "Bank defendants" Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b)(6) 30 is 9/11/2013. Deadline for defendants to file Reply is 9/20/2013. Denying 35 Plaintiff's Motion for Defendants to Produce and Provide to the Court Original Documents. Scheduling Conference set for 9/19/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Deadline to file proposed Scheduling Order is 9/12/2013. Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (mjwcd)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. The portion of the 3 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction of Rule 120 seeking a preliminary injunction is denied. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/20/13.(mnfsl, )
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFF Status Conference set for 8/21/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/26/2013. (mjwcd)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying 3 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction of Rule 120 requesting the issuance of a temporary restraining order. The Court will not schedule that portion of plaintiff's motion requesting a preliminary injunction until plaintiff files an information sheet as required by Local Rule 65.1C. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/24/2013. (klyon, )
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Recusal, This matter is before the Court sua sponte. I have a financial interest in Defendant, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., through ownership of shares in three mutual funds managed by a wholly-owned securities affiliate of this Defendant. Pur suant to 28 U.S.C. §455(b)(4) and the Code of Conduct of Conduct for United States Judges, my recusal in this matter is required. Accordingly, I hereby RECUSE myself from hearing this matter. The Clerk shall randomly reassign this case to another District Judge of this Court. by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/21/2013. (ervsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: May v. U.S. Bank N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert (I) J. Aronowitz
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Tew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Cancanon
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Tew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Aronowitz
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Tew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Nadia G. Malik
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank N.A.
Represented By: Nadia G. Malik
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa (I) Cancanon
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Tew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gregory May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?