Jordan v. Cooley, et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Jordan
Defendant: Carriage Park Condo, J. Van Kamp, City of Aurora, D. Cooley and Dennis Helk
Case Number: 1:2013cv01650
Filed: June 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Final JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Carriage Park Condo, City of Aurora, D. Cooley, Dennis Houck, J. Van Kamp against Aaron Jordan re: 56 Order, by Clerk on 3/10/2014. (klyon, )
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER denying 43 Motion to Suppress Evidence Challenging Police/Courts [sic] Conduct and denying 44 Motion for Stay of Execution Pending Appeal Pursuant Crim. Rule 37(f). By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/16/2013.(klyon, )
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER Denying 35 pro se plaintiff's Motion for Stay of Execution Pending Appeal Pursuant Crim. Rule 37(f). Denying 36 Motion to Suppress Evidence Challenging Police/Courts [sic] Conduct, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/6/2013.(mjwcd)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFF Status Conference set for 8/21/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/25/2013. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Cooley, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carriage Park Condo
Represented By: Henry L. Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Van Kamp
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Represented By: Carrie Lynn Slinkard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Aurora
Represented By: Julia A. Bannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Cooley
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Represented By: Carrie Lynn Slinkard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Helk
Represented By: Henry L. Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?