O'Brien v. Airport Concessions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert O'Brien
Defendant: Airport Concessions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01700
Filed: June 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's 55 Renewed Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs, and an Incentive Award for the Class Representative. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 01/16/2015. (athom, )
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 06/18/2014. (athom, )
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/6/14. A Settlement Conference is set for 6/18/2014 03:30 PM in Courtroom A 602 before Judge Christine M. Arguello. (dkals, )
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying as moot 3 Motion for Class Certification by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/17/14.(dkals, )
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/15/14: parties shall file a status report by 1/17/14 addressing whether the Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification is opposed. (dkals, )
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/15/2013. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/16/13. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Brien v. Airport Concessions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airport Concessions, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan George Pray
Represented By: Hubert A. Farbes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert O'Brien
Represented By: Adam Michael Tamburelli
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Represented By: Frank James Stretz
Represented By: Todd Elliott Mair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?