Lambiase v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Lynnell Lambiase
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv01741
Filed: July 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 36 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice, each party to pay his or its own costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/18/15. (ktera)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER that this matter is set for trial to jury on August 3, 2015, at 8:30 a.m., in Courtroom A, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. A trial preparation conference is set for July 10, 2015, at 2:00 p.m. in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado 34 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/31/15. (ktera)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Richard P. Matsch: Final Pretrial Conference held on 3/30/2015. Granting 32 Motion for Discovery. 5-day Jury Trial set for 8/3/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A before Senior Judge Richard P. Ma tsch. Trial Preparation Conference set for 7/10/2015 at 02:00 PM before Senior Judge Richard P. Matsch. Jury Trial set for 8/4/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A before Senior Judge Richard P. Matsch. Jury Trial set for 8/5/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A before Senior Judge Richard P. Matsch. Jury Trial set for 8/6/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A before Senior Judge Richard P. Matsch. Jury Trial set for 8/7/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A before Senior Judge Richard P. Matsch. FTR: K. Terasaki. (rkeec)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2015 02:00 PM in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The proposed Final Pretrial Order, original only, shall be delivered in paper form directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on March 26, 2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/9/2015. (evana, )
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Mr. David M. Roth having entered his 29 appearance as counsel for the plaintiff, it is ORDERED that the February 20, 2015, status conference is vacated, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/17/2015. (evana, )
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that the status conference will be held on February 20, 2015, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom A, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. If Ms. Lambiase does not appear at this conference, this civil action will be dismissed without prejudice, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/6/2015. (evana, )
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Setting Jury Trial set for 2/9/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A, Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2015 02:00 PM in Conference Room, lead counsel present in person, and Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/15/2015, in paper form directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/26/2014. (jsmit)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR CALENDAR CALL set for 9/26/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A, and joint statement to be handed up when the case is called, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/25/2014. (jsmit)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 13 Motion: Plaintiff, Lynell Lambiase, is ordered to attend a Fed.R.Civ.P. 35 examination with George Schakaraschwili, M.D., on July 19, 2014, at 3:00 p.m. at Village Physical Therapy, 545 E. Pikes Peak Ave., Suite 320, Colorado Springs, 80903, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/12/2014.(jsmit )
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/22/2013 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on August 15, 2013, lead counsel present in person and no parties permitted. Initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar days before the scheduling conference, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/10/2013. (rpmcd )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lambiase v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynnell Lambiase
Represented By: Trent Thomas King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott Calvin James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?