Seng v. Americana Investments, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Chun Chee Seng
Defendant: Brian D. West, Anderson-Clarke Law, Margaret V. Anderson-Clarke, Americana Investments, LLC and West Law Group, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01745
Filed: July 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 112 Order for Judgment by Clerk on 9/10/2014. (alowe )
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER DISCHARGING 108 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND DISMISSING CLAIMS AGAINST REMAINING DEFENDANTS: Plaintiff's claims against defendants Margaret V. Anderson-Clarke and Anderson-Clarke Law are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/9/2014. (alowe)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; adopting in part Report and Recommendations 96 , by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/21/2014.(trlee, )
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER adopting 91 Report and Recommendations, overruling 100] APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court and granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Dismiss, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/20/2014.(trlee, )
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Robert E. Blackburn: Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference held on 8/8/2014; Trial Preparation Conference held on 8/8/2014. The Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for this date are vacated. The trial set for 8/18/14 is vacated. 90 Consent Motion for Trial by Court is GRANTED. Court Reporter: Tracy Weir. (cpear)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 97 Motion for Order to appear telephonically, counsel for the defendants, Mr. Brian West SHALL participate in the Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation Conference by telephone. Counsel shall contact the chambers of Judge Robert E. Blackburn at 303-335-2350, at the date and time designated for this hearing. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/6/2014.(trlee, )
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 82 Motion to Compel. On or before August 8, 2014, shall answer in full and respond to Plaintiff's First Request for Interrogatories. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff is awarded costs and attorney fees, against Defendant Americana, incurred in pursing the Motion to Compel. Plaintiff shall, on or before August 11, 2014, submit an accounting for reasonable costs associated with the preparation and presentation of the motion, including attorneys fees. Any objections to the reasonableness of the amount claimed shall be filed on or before August 18, 2014, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/31/14.(sgrim)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MINUTE ORDER denying 65 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 66 Motion for Summary Judgment. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/28/14. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/25/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 8/1/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Seven (7) day Jury Trial set for 8/18/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/17/13. (rebsec, )
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/2/2013 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/10/13. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seng v. Americana Investments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian D. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson-Clarke Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret V. Anderson-Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americana Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Law Group, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chun Chee Seng
Represented By: Michael Joseph Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?