CECO Concrete Construction, LLC v. Centennial State Carpenters Pension Trust

Plaintiff: CECO Concrete Construction, LLC
Defendant: Centennial State Carpenters Pension Trust
Counter_claimant: Board of Trustees of the Centennial State Carpenters Pension Trust and Centennial State Carpenters Pension Trust
Counter_defendant: CECO Concrete Construction, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv01749
Filed: July 3, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2015 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion for Reconsideration; granting 46 Motion to Amend Judgment; granting 53 Motion to Stay. Enforcement of the Court's Amended Final Judgment is hereby stayed pending the conclusion of the pending appellate process. No supersedeas bond is required as a condition of the stay. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 06/02/2015. (athom, )
December 18, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 39 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The June 7, 2013 Final Award (including the Interim Award incorporated by reference therein) entered by Arbitrator Brand is affirmed. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/18/14.(jdyne, )
July 16, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 07/16/2013. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CECO Concrete Construction, LLC v. Centennial State Carpenters Pension Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CECO Concrete Construction, LLC
Represented By: Robert Patrick Casey
Represented By: Richard Lee Samson
Represented By: Roger Glenn Trim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centennial State Carpenters Pension Trust
Represented By: Michael P. Monaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Board of Trustees of the Centennial State Carpenters Pension Trust
Represented By: Michael P. Monaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Centennial State Carpenters Pension Trust
Represented By: Michael P. Monaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: CECO Concrete Construction, LLC
Represented By: Robert Patrick Casey
Represented By: Richard Lee Samson
Represented By: Roger Glenn Trim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?