George et al v. Urban Settlement Services et al.
Plaintiff: Richard George, Steven Leavitt and Sandra Leavitt
Defendant: Urban Settlement Services and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01819
Filed: July 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER ACCEPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S RECOMMENDATION by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 05/10/2018. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 113 is accepted. The Motion to Intervene by Ajay Sood, a Victim of Bank of America, N.A.'s H.A.M.P. Fraud 85 and the Motion to Intervene Under F.R.C.P. § 24(b) Re: H.A.M.P. Loan Modification Fraud 90 are denied. (sphil, )
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/19/18 re Motion to Intervene by Ajay Sood, A Victim of Bank of America, N.A.'s H.A.M.P. Fraud 85 and Motion to Intervene Under F.R.C.P. 24(b) Re: H.A.M.P. Loan Modification Fraud 90 .The Court respectfully RECOMMENDS that the Motions [#85, #90] be DENIED. (lgale, )
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying 69 Motion of Defendant Bank of America, N.A. to Strike Class Allegations by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/21/2017. (sphil, )
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDERED that judgment is hereby entered in favor of defendants Urban Settlement Services and Bank of America, N.A. and against plaintiffs Richard George, Steven Leavitt, Sandra Leavitt, and Darrell Dalton. ORDERED that defendants are AWARDED their costs, to be taxed by the Clerkof the Court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1. ORDERED that this case is dismissed in its entirety by Clerk on 09/30/14. (jhawk, )
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s Motion to Stay Discovery. Discovery is stayed pending adjudication of Defendant Urban Lending's 13 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint and Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s 14 Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint with the exception that Defendants shall supplement their initial disclosures on or before January 31, 2014 to identify each employee who handled each named Plai ntiff's loan modification(s) and workout request(s) on a substantive, individual loan-level basis, to the extent such people are identifiable from Defendants' loan files, and note (a) whether the identified employees are still employed by the respective Defendant and (b) if former employees, their last known addresses and telephone numbers. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/6/14.(mnfsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George et al v. Urban Settlement Services et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard George
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Tyler Stuart Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Leavitt
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Tyler Stuart Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Leavitt
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Tyler Stuart Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urban Settlement Services
Represented By: Sarah Block Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?