Sabino v. Rahimpour et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Sabino and Thomas (I) Sabino
Defendant: Zia Rahimpour, Aghdas Rouhani, Arghavan Almony, Mehraghdas Rouhani, Ziaollah Rahimpour and Parvin Rahimpour
Case Number: 1:2013cv01820
Filed: July 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Michael J Watanabe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2014 Filing 41 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 07/14/2014. Text Only Entry (athom, )
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER In view of #39 Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice, the Status Conference and Show Cause Hearing 7/15/2014 10:00 AM are vacated. Order to Show Cause #16 is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/14/2014. (emill)
July 14, 2014 Filing 39 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Defendants Arghavan Almony, Parvin Rahimpour, Zia Rahimpour, Aghdas Rouhani. (West, Jerad)
July 10, 2014 Filing 38 STATUS REPORT by Defendants Arghavan Almony, Parvin Rahimpour, Zia Rahimpour, Aghdas Rouhani. (West, Jerad)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER Final Pretrial Conference 7/8/2014 09:00 AM is vacated, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/2/2014. (emill)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot #33 Motion to Continue (Status Report). The requests in the Status Report were addressed by the court during the Status Conference held 5/13/2014 #34 . By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/14/2014. Text Only Entry(emill)
May 14, 2014 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM regarding #33 MOTION to Continue filed by Thomas (I) Sabino. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 05/14/14. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
May 13, 2014 Filing 34 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Telephonic Show Cause Hearing / Status Conference held on 5/13/2014. Order to Show Cause #16 is continued up to and including 7/15/2014 or as otherwise ordered by the Court. Telephonic Show Cause Hearing / Status Conference set for 7/15/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (emill)
May 13, 2014 Filing 33 First STATUS REPORT Regarding Probate Approval by Plaintiff Thomas (I) Sabino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Probate Court Minute Order)(O'Connell, John) Modified on 5/14/2014 pursuant to chambers (athom, ).
April 24, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John T. O'Connell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (O'Connell, John)
February 11, 2014 Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER granting #29 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Status Conference and Show Cause Hearing Set for 2/13/14. Status Conference / Show Cause Hearing set 2/13/2014 09:30 AM is vacated. Status Conference / Show Cause Hearing reset for 5/13/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. (mjwcd)
February 11, 2014 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM regarding #29 MOTION to Continue Show Cause and Status Hearing filed by Thomas (I) Sabino. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 02/11/14. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
February 11, 2014 Filing 29 MOTION to Continue Show Cause and Status Hearing by Plaintiff Thomas (I) Sabino. (O'Connell, John)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER granting #26 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Vacate Show Cause Hearing and Status Conference. Show Cause Hearing and Status Conference 12/6/2013 10:30 AM is vacated. Show Cause Hearing reset for 2/13/2014 09:30 AM, at the same time as the Status Conference already set, in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/22/2013.(mjwcd)
November 21, 2013 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM regarding #26 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Show Cause Hearing and Status Conference filed by Thomas (I) Sabino. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/21/13. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
November 21, 2013 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Show Cause Hearing and Status Conference by Plaintiff Thomas (I) Sabino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) (Proposed) Order Re: Motion to Vacate Show Cause Hearing and Status Conference)(O'Connell, John)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER Due to a conflict on the court's docket, the telephonic Show Cause Hearing and Status Conference set 12/4/2013 09:30 AM are vacated. Telephonic Show Cause Hearing and Status Conference reset for 12/6/2013 10:30 AM by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/14/2013. (mjwcd)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER granting #22 Request to Vacate All Deadlines and Hold Case in Abeyance Pending Court Approval of Minor Settlement by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/22/13. A Status Conference is set for 2/13/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502, before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, and all deadlines concerning the settling parties are stayed. (dkals, )
October 17, 2013 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM regarding #22 MOTION to Vacate filed by Arghavan Almony, Parvin Rahimpour, Zia Rahimpour, Aghdas Rouhani. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/17/13. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
October 16, 2013 Filing 22 NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Vacate All Deadlines and Hold Case in Abeyance Pending Court Approval of Minor Settlement by Defendants Arghavan Almony, Parvin Rahimpour, Zia Rahimpour, Aghdas Rouhani (Chaney, Lelia) Modified on 10/17/2013 to change event (dkals, ).
September 17, 2013 Filing 21 DESIGNATION OF NON-PARTY by Defendants Arghavan Almony, Parvin Rahimpour, Zia Rahimpour. (West, Jerad)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER reinstating this case and dismissing with prejudice Thomas (I) Sabino (individually) by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/13/13. (dkals, )
September 12, 2013 Filing 19 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 9/12/13. Text Only Entry (dkals, )
September 12, 2013 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Thomas Sabino by Defendants Arghavan Almony, Parvin Rahimpour, Zia Rahimpour. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Chaney, Lelia)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/10/2013. (mjwcd)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Returnable by plaintiffs; plaintiffs shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed as against defendant Aghdas Rouhani, a/k/a Mehraghdas Rouhani pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) for failing to serve the defendant and failure to prosecute. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/4/2013 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/10/2013. (mjwcd)
September 10, 2013 Filing 15 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Scheduling Conference held on 9/10/2013. Fact Discovery due by 3/7/2014. Expert Discovery due by 4/11/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 5/6/2014. Telephonic Show Cause Hearing/Status Conference set for 12/4/2013 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/1/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/8/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (mjwcd)
September 3, 2013 Filing 14 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants Arghavan Almony, Parvin Rahimpour, Zia Rahimpour, Aghdas Rouhani. (West, Jerad)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Time of Scheduling/Planning Conference. Scheduling Conference 9/10/2013 11:00 AM is vacated. Scheduling Conference reset for 9/10/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/22/2013.(mjwcd)
August 22, 2013 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM regarding #11 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Time of Scheduling/Planning Conference filed by Thomas Sabino, Thomas (I) Sabino. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 08/22/13. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
August 22, 2013 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Time of Scheduling/Planning Conference by Plaintiffs Thomas Sabino, Thomas (I) Sabino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) (Proposed) Order Re: Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Time of Scheduling/Planning Conference)(O'Connell, John)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/10/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/12/2013. (mjwcd)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Magistrate Judge Watanabe is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 60 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C. COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 07/11/13. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
July 11, 2013 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued. (agarc, )
July 10, 2013 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Zia and Parvin Rahimpour on 6/22/2013. (agarc, )
July 10, 2013 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Arghavan Almony, Parvin Rahimpour, Zia Rahimpour, and Aghdas Rouhani, filed by Thomas Sabino, Thomas (I) Sabino.(agarc, )
July 10, 2013 Filing 5 STATE COURT ORDER Regarding Service of Process by El Paso County District Judge Timothy J. Schutz 6/19/2013. (agarc, )
July 10, 2013 Filing 4 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Arghavan Almony, Parvin Rahimpour, Zia Rahimpour, and Aghdas Rouhani, filed by Thomas Sabino, Thomas (I) Sabino.(agarc, )
July 10, 2013 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
July 10, 2013 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Arghavan Almony, Parvin Rahimpour, Zia Rahimpour.(Chaney, Lelia)
July 10, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Arghavan Almony, Zia Rahimpour, Parvin Rahimpour from District Court, El Pas County, Case Number 2013cv30204. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-3442352), filed by Arghavan Almony, Zia Rahimpour, Parvin Rahimpour. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Appendix A-1, #4 Appendix A-2, #5 Appendix A-3, #6 Appendix A-4, #7 Appendix A-5, #8 Appendix A-6, #9 Appendix A-7, #10 Appendix A-8, #11 Appendix A-9)(Chaney, Lelia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabino v. Rahimpour et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zia Rahimpour
Represented By: Jerad A. West
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aghdas Rouhani
Represented By: Jerad A. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arghavan Almony
Represented By: Jerad A. West
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mehraghdas Rouhani
Represented By: Jerad A. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ziaollah Rahimpour
Represented By: Jerad A. West
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parvin Rahimpour
Represented By: Jerad A. West
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Sabino
Represented By: John T. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas (I) Sabino
Represented By: John T. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?