Cope v. Packaging Corp of America
Plaintiff: Angela Cope
Defendant: Packaging Corp of America
Case Number: 1:2013cv01918
Filed: July 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER I am informed that this case has been resolved. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that on or before May 26, 2014, the parties shall file a stipulation or motion to dismiss with prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a). Dismissal Paper due by 5/26/2014, (evana, )
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/24/14. (jdyne, )
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a four day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on August 4, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for July 9, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/04/2013. See order for details. (rbjsec. )
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 07/19/2013. (rbjsec )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cope v. Packaging Corp of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Packaging Corp of America
Represented By: Emily Hobbs-Wright
Represented By: Brian Michael Mumaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Cope
Represented By: Robert Mark Liechty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?