May 4, 2016 |
Filing
203
MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing proceedings held before Judge John L. Kane on 5/4/2016. Finding as moot 196 Motion for Protective Order. Court Reporter: Kara Spitler. (babia)
|
December 11, 2015 |
Filing
192
ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (resolving Docs. 187 , 189 , and 191 ). Counsel are directed to CONFER and counsel for Plaintiff SHALL SUBMIT a proposed form of Judgment, with interest calculations, on or before noon on Tuesday, December 15, 2015. By Judge John L. Kane on 12/11/2015. (athom, )
|
November 6, 2015 |
Filing
183
STIPULATION AND ORDER GOVERNING THE CUSTODY AND DISPOSITION OF TRIAL EXHBITS, DEPOSITIONS, TRANSCRIPTS, AND PAPERS by Judge John L. Kane on 11/6/2015. (babia)
|
September 23, 2015 |
Filing
143
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 126 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/23/2015.(mlace, )
|
November 3, 2014 |
Filing
134
SECOND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/9/2015. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set 10/16/2015 11:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Eight (8) day Jury Trial set 11/2/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/3/14. (rebsec)
|
October 14, 2014 |
Filing
129
ORDER FOR STATUS REPORTS: Status Report due by 10/17/2014. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/14/2014. (alowe)
|
October 1, 2014 |
Filing
118
ORDER granting 116 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Kenneth Carpenter Claims with prejudice. The claims of plaintiff, Kenneth Carpenter against defendant, American Family Insurance Company are dismissed with prejudice, with each of the affected parties to pay its own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/1/2014.(alowe)
|
September 8, 2014 |
Filing
114
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/8/2014. ORDERED: (WITHDRAWN) 89 Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Robert Dietz Pursuant to Fed.R.Evid. 702 is WITHDRAWN. Plaintiff's counsel must provide a supplemental report regarding the specific opinions they intend to illicit from Robert Dietzs report by 12:00 p.m. on September 10, 2014. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont)
|
September 4, 2014 |
Filing
113
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 9/4/2014. ORDERED: Plaintiffs Second Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Supplement Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures 96 is DENIED. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for September 8, 2014 at 11:30 a.m. to discuss whether defense counsel is withdrawing their Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Robert Dietz Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 89 . Counsel participating in the Telephone Conference sha ll initiate a conference call among themselves and then call the court at (303) 844-2117 at the scheduled time. Plaintiff's counsel must provide a supplemental report regarding the specific opinions they intend to illicit from Robert Dietzs rep ort by 12:00 p.m. on September 10, 2014. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery of John Haberland 102 is DENIED. This ruling is made from the bench and the time in which to file an objection starts from today's date. (amont) Modified on 9/4/2014 to add phone number for conference call (amont).
|
June 16, 2014 |
Filing
84
ORDER of Dismissal to the October 30, 2012 Claim, Only. The Stipulated Motion To Dismiss The October 30, 2012 Claim Without Prejudice [# 82 ] filed June 13, 2014, is GRANTED. By June 30, 2014, the parties shall file a joint status report. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/16/2014. (klyon, )
|
February 20, 2014 |
Filing
28
PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/20/14. (cbssec)
|
January 30, 2014 |
Filing
23
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Discovery Hearing held on 1/30/2014. ORDERED: 17 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order is GRANTED. The deadline for amending Plaintiffs' Complaint is ext ended to 3/1/2014 to expand the prayer for relief to include a request for punitive damages. ORDERED: A Discovery Hearing is set for 2/14/2014 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Plaintiffs and general counsel for Defendant are to be physically present. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
|
October 10, 2013 |
Filing
16
TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/10/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 10/17/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Fourteen (14) day Jury Trial set for 11/3/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/10/13. (rebsec, )
|
July 30, 2013 |
Filing
8
ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 9/9/2013 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/30/13. (cbssec)
|
July 25, 2013 |
Filing
5
ORDER Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Two Week Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. by NONE on 07/23/2013. (dbera, )
|