Veren v. Abbott Laboratoires et al
Plaintiff: David W. Veren
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Lundbeck, Inc. and Ovation Research, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv02089
Filed: August 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Teller
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER of dismissal with prejudice, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/24/2014. (trlee, )
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 61 the parties Joint Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Party Abbott Laboratories with prejudice, each party to pay its or his own costs and attorney fees, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/17/2014.(evana, )
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/15/2014. Plaintiff to provide information as to additional dentists on or before 7/22/2014.Granting 57 Moti on for Expert Discovery. Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Joint Proposed Amended Scheduling Order due 7/25/2014. Court Reporter: FTR - E. E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (emill)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Stipulation and PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/6/14. (dkals, )
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 APPOINTMENT ORDER Granting 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by David W. Veren. The Clerk shall select, notify, and appoint counsel to represent the pro se litigant in this civil matter. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/23/2013. (mjwcd)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER To Draw Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 08/06/13. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veren v. Abbott Laboratoires et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W. Veren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lundbeck, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ovation Research, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?