Bovino v. Amazon.com, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jerald A. Bovino
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv02111
Filed: August 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Pitkin
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND DENYING MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT: Amazon's Motion for Attorney Fees 77 is DENIED. The Court OVERRULES Mr. Bovino's Objections (#97), ADOPTS the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation 96 , and DENIES Mr. Bovino's Motion to Enforce 84 . Mr. Bovino's Motion for Leave to File a Surreply 87 is DENIED AS MOOT. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/14/16.(msksec, )
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting 52 Motion for Summary Judgment by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/1/15.(pglov)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/5/14. (msksec, )
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER granting 45 Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/4/14.(dkals, )
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Motion Hearing held on 3/11/2014.Taking under advisement 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File to Amend Complaint. Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (mjwcd)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER taking under advisement 33 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/5/2014.(mjwcd, ) Modified on 3/6/2014. ORDER WAS DOCKETED IN ERROR AND DOES NOT PERTAIN TO THIS CASE. (klyon, ).
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 29 is amended to extend the deadline to join parties and amend pleadings up to and including 1/8/2014. Status Conference 12/19/2013 09:00 AM is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/2/2013.(mjwcd)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/13/2013. (mjwcd)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER denying 23 [Motion] Stipulated Protective Order. The parties must file a separate Motion for Protective Order outlining the requirements as set forth in Fed. Civ. P. 26(c), and attach the Stipulated Protective Order to that motion. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/12/2013.(mjwcd)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER granting 20 plaintiff's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 29 amended to extend the deadline to join parties and amend pleadings up to and including 11/14/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/5/2013.(mjwcd)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/30/2013. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bovino v. Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerald A. Bovino
Represented By: Ronnie Fischer
Represented By: Ralph M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?