Molycorp Minerals, LLC v. Mingus Constructors, Inc.
Plaintiff: Molycorp Minerals, LLC
Defendant: Mingus Constructors, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv02141
Filed: August 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying 14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Administratively Closing Case. Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order [# 24 ] is DENIED AS MOOT. Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Reconsideration of Court's Order of December 9, 2013 23 Striking Defendant's Moving Papers [20, 21. 22], and Request for Leave To File Amended Motion and Extend Page Limitations [# 29 ] is DENIED AS MOOT. Pending the completion of arbitration, the clerk is DIRECTED to close this case administratively. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/17/2013. (klyon, )
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER striking 20 Motion in Accordance With Rules 12(b)(1) and (3) to Stay, or in the Alternative, Dismiss The Action and Compel Arbitration, For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and/or Improper Venue; Memorandum of Points and Authoritie s; Declarations of Guy W. Bluff and Michael F. Minchella in Supprt Thereof. The Declaration of Guy W. Bluff in Support of Motion to Stay the Action, or in the Alternative, Dismiss The Action and Compel Arbitration [# 21 ] and the Declaration of Mich ael F. Minchella in Support of Motion to Stay the Action, or in the Alternative, Dismiss The Action and Compel Arbitration [# 22 ], both filed 12/6/2013, are also STRICKEN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/9/2013.(klyon, ) Modified on 12/9/2013 to create linkage (klyon, ).
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting 10 plaintiff's Motion to Vacate and Reschedule September 24, 2013 Hearing. Scheduling Conference 9/24/2013 03:00 PM is vacated. Scheduling Conference reset for 11/21/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 0/16/2013.(mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molycorp Minerals, LLC v. Mingus Constructors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mingus Constructors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molycorp Minerals, LLC
Represented By: Bradford Craig Berge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?