March 2, 2016 |
Filing
252
STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/2/2016. (agarc, )
|
February 25, 2016 |
Filing
234
ORDER. ORDERED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), all claims against defendant John Deere Limited are dismissed, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/25/16. (jhawk, )
|
February 11, 2016 |
Filing
220
ORDER. ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 187 is held in abeyance. ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2 188 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. ORDERED that Kirk Ney may not testify regarding the total number of hours in which the Model 4600 tractor has been operated. ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 3 189 is held in abeyance. ORDERED that plaintiffs Motion in Limine No. 4 190 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. ORDERED that plain tiffs Motion in Limine No. 5 191 is GRANTED. ORDERED that defendants may not introduce Exhibit A. ORDERED that plaintiffs Motion in Limine No. 6 196 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part.ORDERED that defendants' Proposed Jury Instruction No. 19 is rejected. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/11/16.(jhawk, )
|
February 10, 2016 |
Filing
219
ORDER. ORDERED that defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Undisclosed Witnesses 194 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. ORDERED that defendants' Motion in Limine to Preclude Testimony by W. Glenn Soileau, Documents from the Soile au Case and Evidence of Discovery Disputes 195 is GRANTED. ORDERED that defendants Motion in Limine to Exclude Newly Disclosed Exhibits 197 is GRANTED in part and held in abeyance in part. ORDERED that defendants Motion in Limine to Preclude Pl aintiff from Relying on Deposition Testimony for Witnesses within Subpoena Power or Present at Trial 199 is GRANTED. ORDERED that plaintiff may not introduce the deposition testimony of Jason Elwood, Kim Powers, or Earl Bernard pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 32(a)(4) and may not introduce portions of Kirk Ney's deposition testimony pursuant to Fed. R. CivP. 32(a)(3). Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/10/16.(jhawk, )
|
February 8, 2016 |
Filing
216
ORDER. Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Thomas Berry 104 is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in the attached order. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/8/16.(pabsec)
|
January 28, 2016 |
Filing
178
ORDER. Defendants' motion for summary judgment 108 is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's second, fourth, and fifth claims for relief are dismissed. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/28/16.(pabsec)
|
September 16, 2015 |
Filing
155
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 09/16/15 DENYING 82 Motion for Default Judgment; and DENYING 98 Motion for Entry of Default.(nmarb, )
|
September 4, 2015 |
Filing
152
ORDER Setting Case for Trial. Jury Trial set for 2/16/2016 08:00 AM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/26/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/04/15. (jhawk, )
|
August 28, 2015 |
Filing
145
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 08/28/15 on Pending Discovery Motions. ORDER; DENYING 89 Plaintiff's Motion & Memorandum in Support Thereof to Depose Mr. Carlton Hern (sic); DENYING 99 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Depose Witnesses and Compel Production of Documents; DENYING 100 Plaintiff's Second Motion To Modify Scheduling Order ; DENYING 118 Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Reply to Motion to Depose Carlton Hearn; and DENYING 121 Pla intiff's Motion To Defer Determination of or to Deny Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Discovery in this matter is CLOSED and the Parties are hereby prohibited from filing any further discovery motions, without specific leave of court. (nmarb, )
|
August 27, 2015 |
Filing
142
COURTROOM MINUTES/ MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang: taking under advisement 82 Motion for Default Judgment; taking under advisement 89 Motion for Ruling; taking under advisement 98 Motion for Entry of D efault; taking under advisement 99 Motion for Leave; taking under advisement 100 Motion for Extension of Time to File ; taking under advisement 114 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; taking under advisement 121 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; granting 126 Motion to Withdraw Document; granting 128 Motion to Supplement; Motion Hearing held on 8/27/2015. FTR: Courtroom C204. (bdiem)
|
March 23, 2015 |
Filing
77
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion to Compel; granting 74 Motion to Compel. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3-23-15. (nywlc2)
|
March 3, 2015 |
Filing
69
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/3/15 granting 56 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Designate Expert Witnesses and Extend Discovery Cut-Off. Discovery due by 5/29/2014. (bsimm, )
|
February 27, 2015 |
Filing
66
MINUTE ORDER denying 61 Motion to Shorten Time by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 02/27/15.(jhawk, )
|
October 27, 2014 |
Filing
38
ORDER. Ordered that the Motion for Protective Order [Doc. # 33] is DENIED as moot. Ordered that the Motion to Substitute [Doc. # 32] is GRANTED, and Kenneth E. Peck of the Peck Law Firm, LLC, is allowed to withdraw and shall have no continuing responsibility in the action by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/27/14.(jhawk, )
|
October 21, 2014 |
Filing
31
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/21/14. The case should proceed through discovery, including the plaintiff's deposition. The protective order prohibiting the plaintiff's deposition beginning on October 1, 2014, is VACATED. (bsimm, )
|
June 12, 2014 |
Filing
21
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/12/14 re: Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order 19 . The Motion is GRANTED and the Scheduling Order is amended as follows: Expert Witness Disclosures: 1/14/2015; Rebuttal Experts: 2/13/2015; Discovery Cut-off: 3/16/2015; Dispositive Motion Deadline: 5/14/2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Pretrial Conference set for January 14, 2015, is vacated and reset to 7/15/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401. The proposed Pretrial Order is due on or before 7/8/2015. (bsimm)
|
September 11, 2013 |
Filing
10
ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/20/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/11/13. (mnfsl, )
|