Hach Company v. In-Situ, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hach Company
Defendant: In-Situ, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv02201
Filed: August 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0001 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 196 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 7/20/2015. Denying without prejudice 170 Motion to Exclude. Denying without prejudice 171 Motion to Exclude. Granting in part a nd denying in part 172 Motion to Exclude. Denying without prejudice 173 Motion in Limine. Granting 174 Motion in Limine. Granting in part and denying in part 175 Motion in Limine. Granting 180 Motion to Compel. ORDERED: In-Situ is REQUIRED to produce all relevant requested documents of the caps and Aqua Troll 400 to Hach by July 23, 2015 at 5:00 p.m. ORDERED: Mr. Godfrey needs to determine if he is bringing the counter claims under the patent statute or common law theory. If he is bringing them in under common law theory, he must cite the common law cases that would support his assessment that the jury decides those questions. Mr. Godfrey must file something with the court by July 21, 2015 at 12:00 p.m. in regards to the counter claims. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont, )
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER that exhibits 181-1 and 181-2 shall remain restricted at Level 1 re: 181 Restricted Document - Level 1, filed by Hach Company, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 07/06/15. (nmarb, )
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER denying 101 Defendant In-Situ, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, denying 104 Hach Company's Motion for Summary Judgment, denying 157 Hach's Motion to Strike New Factual Allegations In-Situ Advances for the First Time in its Response in Opposition to Hach's Motion for Summary Judgment. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 06/16/2015. (cbslc1)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER that 149 Restricted Document - Level 1, filed by Hach Company, shall remain restricted at Level 1, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 05/11/15. (nmarb, )
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/4/14. ORDERED that Plaintiff's 70 Joint MOTION for Protective Order is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that when filing documents under seal parties MUST fully comply with the requirements of D.C.ColoL.CivR. 7.2 and D.C.COLO. ECF. PROC. 5.1. (cbssec)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: In Situ's Motion for Default Judgment 38 , In Situ's Motion for Summary Judgment 35 , and Hach's Motion to Strike 55 are all DENIED. It appearing that the Magistrate J udge stayed discovery in this action pending resolution of the summary judgment motion, the Court directs the parties to immediately contact the Magistrate Judge and commence an expedited period of discovery, with the intention of having this case prepared to proceed to trial within 120 days. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/1/14.(msksec, )
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Scheduling Conference held on 12/2/2013. ORDERED: Defense counsel shall submit an Answer and/or Counterclaims and a Motionfor Summary Judgment no later tha n 12/23/2013. A Status Conference and possible Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 1/6/2014 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. ORDERED: Counsel's oral Motion to withdraw their 27 Motion to Dismiss and 29 Motion for Judicial Notice is GRANTED. 27 and 29 are WITHDRAWN without prejudice. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hach Company v. In-Situ, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hach Company
Represented By: Andrew John Petrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: In-Situ, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?