Atigun, Inc v. Premier Oilfied Equipment Company et al

Plaintiff: Atigun, Inc
Defendant: Premier Oilfield Equipment Company, Tiger Oilfield Tank Company, Hy-Tech Truck & Trailer Manufacturing, LLC and Gary Harms, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2013cv02219
Filed: August 19, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2016 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 142 Unopposed Sixth Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/1/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2016. by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/7/16. (ktera) Modified on 4/8/2016 to terminate the correct motion (ktera).
January 27, 2016 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 123 Unopposed Fifth Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Section 7 of the Scheduling Order is amended. Discovery due by 5/1/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2016, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/27/16. (ktera)
January 15, 2016 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 117 Plaintiff's Unopposed Fourth Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/1/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2016, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/15/16. (ktera)
December 9, 2015 111 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held before Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/9/2015. Defendant Altira Technology Fund V, L.P. is dismissed, for failure to state a claim for relief. Denying 79 Defendants Triple S Irrevocable Trust Fund and Cind y Harms Motion for Summary Judgment. Mr. Heideman shall file a motion to withdraw as counsel and new counsel shall enter an appearance. Deeming moot 83 Defendant Premier Oilfield Equipment Company's Motion to Compel. Resolving as set forth on the record 99 Defendant Premier Oilfield Equipment Company's Renewed Motion to Compel. Terminating 108 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Third Amended Complaint. In the Third Amended Complaint, Justin Heideman, Trustee is substituted as defendant for Triple S Irrevocable Trust Fund. FTR: K. Terasaki. (ebuch)
November 13, 2015 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR HEARING A hearing will be scheduled on Defendants Triple S Irrevokable Trust Fund's and Cindy Harms' motion for summary judgment 79 and Defendant Premier Oil Company's renewed motion to compel 99 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/13/15. (ktera)
October 8, 2015 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Extending Time to File Reply Brief 95 . Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/08/15. (jhawk, )
May 7, 2015 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER Request for Discovery Hearing on Testing of Allegedly Defective Tanks 73 is granted and a hearing is set for June 15, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom A, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/7/15. (ktera)
August 18, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/29/2014 11:00 AM in Conference Room before Judge Richard P. Matsch. The proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on 9/25/14. The conference is conducted with lead counsel present in person. No parties or representatives of parties will be permitted to attend. By Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/18/14. (dkals, )
August 11, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 44 Motion to Strike Exhibit B to Plaintiff's 25 Third Amended Complaint [25-2], by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/11/2014.(jsmit )
August 1, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER On Motions to Dismiss re 43 , 45 , and 46 : Altira Fund's Motion to Dismiss 43 is granted as to Atigun's Eighth Claim for Relief and denied as to Atigun's Ninth Claim for Relief; Premier Oilfield Equipment Company's Motion to Dismiss 45 is granted as to Atigun's Fourth, Sixth, Seventh, Eighth, and Tenth Claims for Relief and denied as to Atiguns Ninth Claim for Relief; Defendants Tiger Oilfield Tank Company, LLC, Hy-Tech Truck & Trailer Manufacturing, LL C, Triple S Irrevocable Trust Fund, Gary Harms, Jr. andCindy Harms' Motion to Dismiss 46 is granted; Atigun's Fourth, Sixth, Seventh, Eighth, and Tenth Claims for Relief are dismissed with prejudice. Atigun's claims for breach of con tract, breach of warranty, and breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing shall go forward against Defendants Tiger, Hy-Tech, and Premier. Atiguns misrepresentation claim shall go forward against Defendants Tiger, Hy-Tech, Premier, and Gary Harms. Atigun's Colorado Uniform Fraudulent Transfer Act claim shall go forward against all Defendants, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/1/2014.(jsmit)
January 30, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO COMPLY WITH D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 re: 23 Protective Order, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/30/2014. (rpmcd)
November 1, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court Courtroom Minutes for Scheduling Conference held on 11/1/2013 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Defendant Gary Harms, Jr.s Withdrawal of 16 Motion for Summary Judgment 17 , is granted and document 16 is withdrawn. Plaintiff's motion to amend complaint is granted and deadline to file third amended complaint is December 16, 2013. Defendants answers/response due January 13, 2014. Informal discovery permitted. No scheduling order entered. FTR: K. Terasaki. (rpmcd )
September 10, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/1/2013 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on October 24, 2013, and lead counsel present. Initial disclosures under R ule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar days before the scheduling conference. Counsel for Defendants Tiger Oilfield Tank Company and Hy-Tech Truck & Trailer Manufacturing, LLC, shall file a disclosure statement pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.4, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/10/2013. (rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atigun, Inc v. Premier Oilfied Equipment Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atigun, Inc
Represented By: Bruce Allyn Moore
Represented By: Robert H. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Oilfield Equipment Company
Represented By: Brewster H. Jamieson
Represented By: Craig Norris Johnson
Represented By: Kieran Anthony Lasater
Represented By: Peter C. Partnow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiger Oilfield Tank Company
Represented By: Raymond Brett Evanson
Represented By: Justin Douglas Heideman
Represented By: William M. Wuestenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hy-Tech Truck & Trailer Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: Raymond Brett Evanson
Represented By: Justin Douglas Heideman
Represented By: William M. Wuestenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Harms, Jr.
Represented By: Raymond Brett Evanson
Represented By: Justin Douglas Heideman
Represented By: William M. Wuestenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?