April 8, 2016 |
Filing
143
ORDER Granting 142 Unopposed Sixth Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/1/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2016. by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/7/16. (ktera) Modified on 4/8/2016 to terminate the correct motion (ktera).
|
January 27, 2016 |
Filing
125
ORDER Granting 123 Unopposed Fifth Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Section 7 of the Scheduling Order is amended. Discovery due by 5/1/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2016, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/27/16. (ktera)
|
January 15, 2016 |
Filing
119
ORDER Granting 117 Plaintiff's Unopposed Fourth Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/1/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2016, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/15/16. (ktera)
|
December 9, 2015 |
Filing
111
COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held before Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/9/2015. Defendant Altira Technology Fund V, L.P. is dismissed, for failure to state a claim for relief. Denying 79 Defendants Triple S Irrevocable Trust Fund and Cind y Harms Motion for Summary Judgment. Mr. Heideman shall file a motion to withdraw as counsel and new counsel shall enter an appearance. Deeming moot 83 Defendant Premier Oilfield Equipment Company's Motion to Compel. Resolving as set forth on the record 99 Defendant Premier Oilfield Equipment Company's Renewed Motion to Compel. Terminating 108 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Third Amended Complaint. In the Third Amended Complaint, Justin Heideman, Trustee is substituted as defendant for Triple S Irrevocable Trust Fund. FTR: K. Terasaki. (ebuch)
|
November 13, 2015 |
Filing
100
ORDER FOR HEARING A hearing will be scheduled on Defendants Triple S Irrevokable Trust Fund's and Cindy Harms' motion for summary judgment 79 and Defendant Premier Oil Company's renewed motion to compel 99 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/13/15. (ktera)
|
October 8, 2015 |
Filing
96
ORDER Extending Time to File Reply Brief 95 . Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/08/15. (jhawk, )
|
May 7, 2015 |
Filing
75
MINUTE ORDER Request for Discovery Hearing on Testing of Allegedly Defective Tanks 73 is granted and a hearing is set for June 15, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom A, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/7/15. (ktera)
|
August 18, 2014 |
Filing
65
ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/29/2014 11:00 AM in Conference Room before Judge Richard P. Matsch. The proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on 9/25/14. The conference is conducted with lead counsel present in person. No parties or representatives of parties will be permitted to attend. By Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/18/14. (dkals, )
|
August 11, 2014 |
Filing
62
ORDER Granting 44 Motion to Strike Exhibit B to Plaintiff's 25 Third Amended Complaint [25-2], by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/11/2014.(jsmit )
|
August 1, 2014 |
Filing
60
ORDER On Motions to Dismiss re 43 , 45 , and 46 : Altira Fund's Motion to Dismiss 43 is granted as to Atigun's Eighth Claim for Relief and denied as to Atigun's Ninth Claim for Relief; Premier Oilfield Equipment Company's Motion to Dismiss 45 is granted as to Atigun's Fourth, Sixth, Seventh, Eighth, and Tenth Claims for Relief and denied as to Atiguns Ninth Claim for Relief; Defendants Tiger Oilfield Tank Company, LLC, Hy-Tech Truck & Trailer Manufacturing, LL C, Triple S Irrevocable Trust Fund, Gary Harms, Jr. andCindy Harms' Motion to Dismiss 46 is granted; Atigun's Fourth, Sixth, Seventh, Eighth, and Tenth Claims for Relief are dismissed with prejudice. Atigun's claims for breach of con tract, breach of warranty, and breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing shall go forward against Defendants Tiger, Hy-Tech, and Premier. Atiguns misrepresentation claim shall go forward against Defendants Tiger, Hy-Tech, Premier, and Gary Harms. Atigun's Colorado Uniform Fraudulent Transfer Act claim shall go forward against all Defendants, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/1/2014.(jsmit)
|
January 30, 2014 |
Filing
24
ORDER TO COMPLY WITH D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 re: 23 Protective Order, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/30/2014. (rpmcd)
|
November 1, 2013 |
Filing
18
Courtroom Minutes for Scheduling Conference held on 11/1/2013 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Defendant Gary Harms, Jr.s Withdrawal of 16 Motion for Summary Judgment 17 , is granted and document 16 is withdrawn. Plaintiff's motion to amend complaint is granted and deadline to file third amended complaint is December 16, 2013. Defendants answers/response due January 13, 2014. Informal discovery permitted. No scheduling order entered. FTR: K. Terasaki. (rpmcd )
|
September 10, 2013 |
Filing
11
ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/1/2013 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on October 24, 2013, and lead counsel present. Initial disclosures under R ule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar days before the scheduling conference. Counsel for Defendants Tiger Oilfield Tank Company and Hy-Tech Truck & Trailer Manufacturing, LLC, shall file a disclosure statement pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.4, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/10/2013. (rpmcd)
|