Nelson et al v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Juanita Nelson and Randel Nelson
Defendant: American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin and American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv02238
Filed: August 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER of dismissal. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/28/2014. (trlee, )
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/23/14. Unopposed First Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order 22 is GRANTED in part. The Scheduling Order [#15] is amended to extend the following deadlines: Affirmative Expert Disclosure Deadline July 29, 2014; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline August 29, 2014; Discovery Deadline September 12, 2014; Dispositive Motions Deadline October 14, 2014. (lgale)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/12/14. (lgale)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Trial Preparation Conference ORDER. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/22/2014. Trial Preparation Conference and Final Pretrial Conference shall commence on 12/29/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. 5 day Jury Trial set to commence on 1/12/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/23/2013. (klyon, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson et al v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Represented By: David Paul Ganderton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Represented By: David Paul Ganderton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Nelson
Represented By: Mickey Wayne Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randel Nelson
Represented By: Mickey Wayne Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?