Frank v. AmFirst Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Deborah K. Frank
Defendant: AmFirst Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2013cv02259
Filed: August 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINAL JUDGMENT re: 31 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Clerk on 01/22/2015. (athom, )
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/12/13. (cbssec)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 11/6/2013 at 9:15 a.m. in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/18/13. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frank v. AmFirst Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmFirst Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah K. Frank
Represented By: Elwyn F. Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?