TDP, Inc. v. Stellar Lasers, LLC
Plaintiff: TDP, Inc.
Defendant: Stellar Lasers, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv02285
Filed: August 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE: all claims asserted by Vergent and Stellar against each other are dismissed with prejudice, and each side shall bear its own costs and fees, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/19/2014 re 39 . (jsmit)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 1/28/2014 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. Discovery with respect to damages is deferred. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 19 , is denied. Defendant's Motion to Compel 32 , is denied. FTR: K. Terasaki. (rpmcd)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 25 Motion for Leave TO AMEND COUNTERCLAIMS : Defendant's First Amended Counterclaims attached thereto is accepted for filing, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/23/2013.(rpmcd)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO COMPLY WITH D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 as to any information to be submitted under restriction based 21 Protective Order, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/25/2013. (rpmcd)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 12 Motion to Amend re 3 and 5 : and the Second Amended Complaint attached as Exhibit B [12-2], is accepted as filed today, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/16/2013.(rpmcd ) Modified on 9/17/2013 (rpmcd).
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/17/2013 at 10:30 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on October 10, 2013 and lead counsel present. Initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar days before the scheduling conference, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/3/2013. (rpmcd )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TDP, Inc. v. Stellar Lasers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stellar Lasers, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Hansen
Represented By: Charlene C. Koonce
Represented By: C. Brenton Kugler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TDP, Inc.
Represented By: William David Byassee
Represented By: Lara Sarah Nochomovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?