MSPBO, LLC v. Adidas North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
MSPBO, LLC |
Defendant: |
Adidas North America, Inc. and Adidas America, Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv02287 |
Filed: |
August 26, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Arapahoe |
Presiding Judge: |
Philip A. Brimmer |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
35 U.S.C. ยง 271 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 28, 2015 |
Filing
103
MINUTE ORDER. The case was dismissed with prejudice as of the entry of the parties' joint stipulation for dismissal with prejudice. No order of dismissal is necessary. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 04/28/15. (jhawk, )
|
September 11, 2014 |
Filing
82
ORDER. ORDERED that Adidas counterclaims against MSPBO, PhatRat Technology, LLC, Paul Jonjak, and Curtis Vock are DISMISSED with prejudice. ORDERED that Garmins counterclaims against MSPBO, PhatRat Technology, LLC, Paul Jonjak, and Curtis Vock are DI SMISSED without prejudice. ORDERED that MSPBO, PhatRat Technology, LLC, Paul Jonjak, Curtis Vock, and Dynastream Innovations, Inc. are hereby terminated as parties to this action. ORDERED that Plaintiff MSPBO, LLCs Motion to Dismiss the Countercla im Asserted by Defendants Adidas North America, Inc., Adidas America, Inc. and Garmin International, Inc. and Non-Party Dynastream Innovations, Inc. [Docket No. 49] and PhatRat Technology LLC, Curtis Vock and Paul Jonjaks Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim and Brief in Support [Docket No. 59] are DENIED as moot by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/11/14.(jhawk, ) (jhawk, ).
|
February 7, 2014 |
Filing
47
ORDER granting 45 Unopposed Motion for Entry of Agreed PretrialSchedule for the Consolidated Civil Actions, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/7/14.(sgrim)
|
January 30, 2014 |
Filing
41
ORDER granting 35 MSPBO LLC's Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Cases Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil Action Nos. 13-cv-02287-PAB-KMT and 13-cv-03388-MSK-CBS shall be consolidated for all purposes. As of the date of this Order, all future pleadings and other filings shall be filed in this case only. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/30/14.(mfiel, )
|
December 23, 2013 |
Filing
31
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/23/13. (sgrim)
|
October 16, 2013 |
Filing
15
ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 12/3/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/16/13. (sgrim)
|
October 10, 2013 |
Filing
11
ORDER SETTING HEARING UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 16. A hearing is set for 11/15/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/10/13. (mnfsl, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?