Elwell et al v. Air Line Pilots Association, International
Plaintiff: Sean Ash, Gerald Elwell, JP Bordewick and Richard Warner
Defendant: Air Line Pilots Association, International
Case Number: 1:2013cv02343
Filed: August 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This action is DIMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/8/2014. (alowe)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying without prejudice the 29 Motion to Certify Class, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/19/2014.(trlee, )
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER approved by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 04/24/2014. (cbslc1)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 1/29/2014. 41 Joint Motion for Approval of Stipulation is GRANTED. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/24/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 10/31/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Three (3) day Jury Trial set for 11/17/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/14/13. (rebsec, )
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Scheduling Conference held on 11/13/2013. Discovery due by 5/30/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 6/27/2014. Final Pretrial Conference/Trial Preparation Con ference is set for 10/31/2014 at 3:00 PM and Trial is set to begin on 11/17/2014 at 8:30 AM before Judge Robert E. Blackburn, separate order to issue. ORDERED: Defense counsel's oral Motion to Withdraw 16 is GRANTED. 16 Motion to Dismiss is WITHDRAWN without prejudice. ORDERED: Defendant shall file an Answer to the Complaint on or before 11/27/2013. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 10/30/2013 at 9:15 a.m. in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/5/13. (cbssec)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re: Motions for Class Certification. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/3/2013. (klyon, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elwell et al v. Air Line Pilots Association, International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Ash
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: Richard M. Paul, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Elwell
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: Richard M. Paul, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JP Bordewick
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: Richard M. Paul, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Warner
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: Richard M. Paul, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Line Pilots Association, International
Represented By: Michael L. Winston
Represented By: Marcus Charles Migliore
Represented By: David W. Furgason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?