Westfield Insurance Company v. Centra, Inc.
Plaintiff: Westfield Insurance Company
Defendant: Noorda Materials and Manufacturing, LLC, Hensel Phelps, Construction Co., Jacobs Engineering Group Inc., Noorda Sheet Metal Company and Centria Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv02419
Filed: September 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P Matsch
Referring Judge: Michael J Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL Pursuant to the stipulation for dismissal with prejudice, this action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorney fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/10/15. (ktera)
December 9, 2015 Filing 90 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss Case with Prejudice by Plaintiff Westfield Insurance Company. (Bartlett, Dennis)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Granting #88 the Stipulated Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline. Dispositive Motions due by 12/21/2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/5/2015.(evana, )
October 2, 2015 Filing 88 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline by Plaintiff Westfield Insurance Company. (Bartlett, Dennis)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Granting #86 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Bradley David Damm is withdrawn and NEF's terminated, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/18/15. Text Only Entry (ktera)
August 18, 2015 Filing 86 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Bradley D. Damm by Defendant Centria Inc., Cross Defendant Centria Inc.. (Hayes, John)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Granting Stipulated Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines #84 . Deadlines are extended as follows: Contradicting expert disclosures: August 12, 2015; Rebuttal expert disclosures: September 11, 2015; Discovery Cut-Off: September 30, 2015; and Dispositive Motion Deadline: October 16, 2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/23/15. (ktera)
July 22, 2015 Filing 84 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery Deadlines (and also filed on behalf of Plaintiff) by Defendant Centria Inc., Cross Defendant Centria Inc.. (Hayes, John) (Modified on 7/23/2015 edited the title to reflect that this is a Motion) (evana, ).
June 18, 2015 Filing 83 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kevin A. Koudelka on behalf of Centria Inc.Attorney Kevin A. Koudelka added to party Centria Inc.(pty:dft) (Koudelka, Kevin)
June 16, 2015 Filing 82 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Michael D. Richardson on behalf of Centria Inc.Attorney Michael D. Richardson added to party Centria Inc.(pty:dft) (Richardson, Michael)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Granting #80 Stipulated Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines 1. Party bearing the burden of persuasion of the issues: June 15, 2015; 2. Contradicting experts: July 29, 2015; and 3. Rebuttal experts: August 28, 2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/22/15. (ktera)
May 22, 2015 Filing 80 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines by Plaintiff Westfield Insurance Company. (Bartlett, Dennis)
April 29, 2015 Filing 79 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Bradley David Damm (Damm, Bradley)
April 29, 2015 Filing 78 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by John Douglas Hayes (Hayes, John)
December 23, 2014 Filing 77 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard P. Matsch: Scheduling Conference held on 12/23/2014. FTR: K. Terasaki. (rkeec)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/23/2014. Discovery due by 9/1/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2015. (rkeec)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/18/2014. (evana, )
December 18, 2014 Filing 74 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order for Entry of Proective Order by Defendant Centria Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Stipulated Protective Order)(Hayes, John)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference. A Scheduling Conference will be held on 12/23/2014 at 02:30 PM in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/31/2014. (athom, )
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Denying #70 Motion for Reconsideration re #68 and #69 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/30/2419.(jsmit)
October 29, 2014 Filing 71 RESPONSE to #70 MOTION for Reconsideration re #69 Judgment, #68 Order, Add and Terminate Parties, Terminate Motions filed by Defendant Jacobs Engineering Group Inc.. (Quiat, Laurin)
October 8, 2014 Filing 70 MOTION for Reconsideration re #69 Judgment, #68 Order, Add and Terminate Parties, Terminate Motions by Plaintiff Westfield Insurance Company. (Ley, Michael)
October 3, 2014 Filing 69 JUDGMENT re #68 Order: Defendant Jacobs Engineering Groups Motion to Dismiss #62 is granted and Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. is dismissed from this civil action, by Clerk on 10/3/2014. (jsmit)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting Jacobs Engineering Group's #62 MOTION to Dismiss : Jacobs is dismissed from this civil action, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/3/2014. (jsmit)
September 5, 2014 Filing 67 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information for Baker & Hostetler LLP AMENDED by Laurin D. Quiat (Quiat, Laurin)
September 5, 2014 Filing 66 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information for Baker & Hostetler LLP by Laurin D. Quiat (Quiat, Laurin)
August 29, 2014 Filing 65 REPLY to Response to #62 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Jacobs Engineering Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Quiat, Laurin)
August 15, 2014 Filing 64 RESPONSE to #62 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiff Westfield Insurance Company. (Bartlett, Dennis)
July 31, 2014 Filing 63 BRIEF in Support of #62 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Jacobs Engineering Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Quiat, Laurin)
July 31, 2014 Filing 62 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Jacobs Engineering Group Inc.. (Quiat, Laurin)
July 29, 2014 Filing 61 Centria, Inc.'s ANSWER to #59 Amended Complaint Westfield Insurance Company's Second Amended Complaint by Centria Inc..(Hayes, John)
July 28, 2014 Filing 60 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew Courtney Baisley on behalf of Jacobs Engineering Group Inc.Attorney Matthew Courtney Baisley added to party Jacobs Engineering Group Inc.(pty:dft) (Baisley, Matthew)
July 17, 2014 Filing 59 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Centria Inc. and Jacobs Engineering Group Inc., filed by Westfield Insurance Company re #58 .(jsmit)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER FOR FILING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re #54 : second amended complaint is granted and Exhibit A [54-1] tendered therewith is ordered filed, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/17/2014. (jsmit)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Amending #55 Order re #56 Notice: this action is dismissed with prejudice as to Defendants Noorda Sheet Metal Company and Noorda Materials and Manufacturing, LLC, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/13/2014. (jsmit)
June 12, 2014 Filing 56 NOTICE of Errata and Request That Claims of Westfield Against Noorda Sheet Metal Company and Noorda Materials and Manufacturing be Dismissed With Prejudice by Plaintiff Westfield Insurance Company (Bartlett, Dennis)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER LIFTING STAY AND DISMISSING CERTAIN CLAIMS AND PARTIES re #54 : Motion to lift the stay is granted. Defendant Hensel Phelps Construction Co. is dismissed with prejudice and Defendants Noorda Sheet Metal Company and Noorda Materials and Manufacturing, LLC, are dismissed without prejudice, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/12/2014. (jsmit )
June 11, 2014 Filing 54 Plaintiff's Combined Joint Motion to Lift Stay, Dismiss Certain Claims and Parties and Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File The Tendered Second Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Bartlett, Dennis) Modified to correct entry on 6/11/2014 (jsmit).
February 20, 2014 Filing 53 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Settlement Conference held on 2/20/2014. No settlement reached. (mjwcd)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #50 Centria, Inc's Unopposed Motion for Leave for Client Representative to Attend the Settlement Conference by Telephone, 2/20/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/13/2014.(mjwcd)
February 12, 2014 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM regarding #50 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe,by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/12/2014. Text Only Entry (rpmcd)
February 12, 2014 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone, MOTION for Leave to by Defendant Centria Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Damm, Bradley)
February 4, 2014 Filing 49 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY of by Plaintiff Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bartlett, Dennis)
January 22, 2014 Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Westfield Insurance Company. Noorda Materials and Manufacturing, LLC served on 1/6/2014, answer due 1/27/2014. (Bartlett, Dennis)
January 3, 2014 Filing 47 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent Form attached. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Mag. Consent Form) (rpmcd)
January 3, 2014 Filing 46 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Noorda Materials and Manufacturing re #45 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Westfield Insurance Company. (Bartlett, Dennis)
January 2, 2014 Filing 45 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Centria Inc., Hensel Phelps, Construction Co., Jacobs Engineering Group Inc., Noorda Sheet Metal Company,and Noorda Materials and Manufacturing, LLC, filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(rpmcd )
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting Defendant Hensel Phelps' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint And Order of Stay re #11 and #21 : Defendant Hensel Phelps' motion to compel arbitration #11 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file first amended complaint #21 is granted. Further proceedings in this action are stayed as to all parties, except the Plaintiff is not precluded from serving the first amended complaint on Noorda Materials and Manufacturing, LLC, and Noorda Materials must respond to the first amended complaint. Order of Reference for Settlement Conference #38 is still in effect, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/2/2014. (rpmcd )
January 2, 2014 Filing 43 Courtroom Minutes for Motions Hearing held on 1/2/2014 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Defendant Hensel Phelps' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings as to Plaintiffs' Claims Against Hensel Phelps #11 , is granted. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint #21 , is granted. First Amended Complaint and Exhibits [21-1] through [21-5] is accepted and filed as of today. Service on Noorda Materials is permitted and Noorda Materials shall file its response in accordance with the rules. Civil action is stayed pending resolution of arbitration proceeding and by agreement of counsel settlement proceedings are excluded from the stay order. The pleading stage of the amended complaint is not stayed. FTR: K. Terasaki. (rpmcd)
January 2, 2014 Filing 42 ANSWER/REPLY to #23 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Westfield Insurance Company.(Bartlett, Dennis)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER Settlement Conference set for 2/20/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Deadline to submit Confidential Settlement Statements to chambers 2/14/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/20/2013. (mjwcd)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER granting #37 Stipulated Motion Requesting a Settlement Conference. On or before 12/19/2013, counsel to contact chambers to schedule the settlement conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/12/2013.(mjwcd)
December 11, 2013 Filing 39 STIPULATION re #37 STIPULATED Motion Requesting A Settlement Conference Corrected Stipulation by Plaintiff Westfield Insurance Company. (Bartlett, Dennis)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Motion #37 referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/11/2013. (rpmcd)
December 11, 2013 Filing 37 STIPULATED Motion Requesting A Settlement Conference by Plaintiff Westfield Insurance Company. (Bartlett, Dennis) Modified on 12/11/2013 (rpmcd).
December 2, 2013 Filing 36 Reply BRIEF in Support of #21 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bartlett, Dennis) Modified (title) on 12/2/2013 (rpmcd, ).
November 27, 2013 Filing 35 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Bradley D. Damm by John Douglas Hayes on behalf of Centria Inc. (Hayes, John)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Minute ORDER Setting Hearing on #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings and #21 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint for 1/2/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom A, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/26/2013. (rpmcd)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 the Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time To File Reply To Motion For Leave To File First Amended Complaint extended to December 3, 2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/13/2013.(ervsl, )
November 13, 2013 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Counter Defendant Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Bartlett, Dennis)
November 11, 2013 Filing 31 RESPONSE to #21 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Counter Claimant Hensel Phelps, Construction Co., Defendant Hensel Phelps, Construction Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kilroy, James)
November 4, 2013 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings as to Plaintiffs Claims against Hensel Phelps filed by Defendant Hensel Phelps, Construction Co.. (Kilroy, James)
October 31, 2013 Filing 29 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Centria Inc., Cross Defendant Centria Inc.. (Hayes, John)
October 25, 2013 Filing 28 Centria, Inc.'s Answer to Noorda Sheet Metal Company's Cross-Claims ANSWER to #13 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Centria Inc..(Hayes, John)
October 25, 2013 Filing 27 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Benton Jordan Barton (Barton, Benton)
October 25, 2013 Filing 26 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Adam B. Wiens (Wiens, Adam)
October 24, 2013 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Centria for Centria Inc.. (Hayes, John)
October 23, 2013 Filing 24 Centria, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Plaintiff's Complaint by Centria Inc..(Hayes, John)
October 21, 2013 Filing 23 DEFENDANT HENSEL PHELPS CONSTRUCTION CO.S ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Westfield Insurance Company by Hensel Phelps, Construction Co..(Kilroy, James)
October 17, 2013 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings as to Plaintiffs Claims against Hensel Phelps filed by Plaintiff Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Response, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Response, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Response, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Response, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Response)(Bartlett, Dennis)
October 17, 2013 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document First Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Other Relief, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Amended Complaint)(Bartlett, Dennis)
October 15, 2013 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Bartlett, Dennis)
October 14, 2013 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Kilroy, James)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, Centria Inc. answer due 10/23/2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/10/2013.(rpmcd )
October 9, 2013 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, to respond to Complaint by Defendant Centria Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hayes, John)
October 8, 2013 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Curtis, Cory)
October 8, 2013 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Jacobs Engineering Group Inc..(Quiat, Laurin)
October 7, 2013 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Wiens, Adam)
October 4, 2013 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , CROSSCLAIM against Centria Inc. by Noorda Sheet Metal Company.(Wiens, Adam)
September 30, 2013 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Hensel Phelps, Construction Co.. Hensel Phelps, Construction Co. answer due 10/21/2013. (Kilroy, James)
September 30, 2013 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings as to Plaintiffs Claims against Hensel Phelps by Defendant Hensel Phelps, Construction Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Kilroy, James)
September 30, 2013 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Westfield Insurance Company. Centria Inc. served on 9/10/2013, answer due 10/1/2013. (Bartlett, Dennis)
September 30, 2013 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Westfield Insurance Company. Noorda Sheet Metal Company served on 9/6/2013, answer due 10/4/2013. (Bartlett, Dennis)
September 19, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Benton Jordan Barton on behalf of Noorda Sheet Metal Company (Barton, Benton)
September 19, 2013 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Noorda Sheet Metal Company. Noorda Sheet Metal Company answer due 10/4/2013. (Wiens, Adam)
September 19, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Adam B. Wiens on behalf of Noorda Sheet Metal Company (Wiens, Adam)
September 12, 2013 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Westfield Insurance Company. Jacobs Engineering Group Inc. served on 9/9/2013, answer due 9/30/2013. (Bartlett, Dennis)
September 12, 2013 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Westfield Insurance Company. Hensel Phelps, Construction Co. served on 9/9/2013, answer due 9/30/2013. (Bartlett, Dennis)
September 6, 2013 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent Form attached. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agarc, )
September 5, 2013 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Richard P. Matsch and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
September 5, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Other Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-3521247), filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #5 Summons Hensel Phelps Summons, #6 Summons Centria Summons, #7 Summons Jacobs Engineering Summons, #8 Summons Noorda Summons, #9 Certificate of Review)(Bartlett, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westfield Insurance Company v. Centra, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noorda Materials and Manufacturing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hensel Phelps, Construction Co.
Represented By: James D. Kilroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacobs Engineering Group Inc.
Represented By: Matthew C. Baisley
Represented By: Cory Murray Curtis
Represented By: Laurin D. Quiat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noorda Sheet Metal Company
Represented By: Benton Jordan Barton
Represented By: Adam B. Wiens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centria Inc.
Represented By: Kevin A. Koudelka
Represented By: Michael D. Richardson
Represented By: Bradley David Damm
Represented By: John D. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westfield Insurance Company
Represented By: Dennis J. Bartlett
Represented By: Michael York Ley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?